blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2347250 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2347250



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 231
03.06.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.04.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
24.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.09.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 17
24.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
24.09.2012 Description Search / examination 14
24.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.01.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.01.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
07.11.2011 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.06.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
06.05.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
04.12.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.12.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.12.2010 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.12.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
12.05.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
22.04.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
22.04.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
22.04.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
03.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
03.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.11.2009 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
21.10.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.10.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 4
21.10.2009 Description International Searching Authority 16
21.10.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 5