blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2347250


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
14.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
05.06.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
29.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
22.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
27.06.2014 (Expected) grant published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
25.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.06.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.04.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.03.2014 Change - German title published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
21.03.2014 Change - English title published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
21.03.2014 Change - French title published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.06.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.01.2012 First examination report
18.01.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.12.2011 Change - extension states published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
15.11.2011 Amendment by applicant
07.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.07.2011  [2011/30]
24.06.2011 Request for examination filed published on  27.07.2011  [2011/30]
13.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.2010 Amendment by applicant
07.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication