blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2347250 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09748935 EP11000172 EP11000173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8981797Global Dossier 17.03.2015B2
US2011181304 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009CH00329 12.10.2009
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2012506059Global Dossier 08.03.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009CH00329 12.10.2009
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2352018Global Dossier 09.01.2013B1
EP2352018 03.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
CH16462008 16.10.2008
EP09748935 12.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2352017Global Dossier 31.07.2013B1
EP2352017 03.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
CH16462008 16.10.2008
EP09748935 12.10.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2347250Global Dossier 30.07.2014B1
EP2347250 27.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009CH00329 12.10.2009
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102187212B 20.08.2014B
CN102187212 14.09.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009CH00329 12.10.2009
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104089991B 04.07.2017B
CN104089991 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
CN200980140636 12.10.2009
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010043065Global Dossier 22.04.2010A1
Priority number Date
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CH699753 30.04.2010A1
Priority number Date
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104198544 10.12.2014A
Priority number Date
CH16462008 16.10.2008
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2352017
 EP2352018