Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2285612

EP2285612 - PROFILE ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A VEHICLE PANE WITH A COWL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/08]PROFILE ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A VEHICLE PANE TO A WATER TANK
[2015/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.05.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elkamet Kunststofftechnik GmbH
Georg-Kramer-Strasse 3
35216 Biedenkopf / DE
[2015/23]
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
Elkamet Kunststofftechnik GmbH
Georg-Kramer-Strasse 3
35216 Biedenkopf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PLATT, Wolfgang
Am Forsthaus 5
35216 Biedenkopf-Kombach / DE
02 / ORTMÜLLER, Michael
Am Hasenlauf 15
35216 Biedenkopf / DE
03 / WELLER, Daniel
Amselweg 9
35764 Sinn / DE
 [2011/08]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/23]
Former [2014/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/30]Dreiss
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/17]Thielking, Klaus , et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/08]Buchhold, Jürgen
Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz & Partner Am Weinberg 15
35096 Weimar (Lahn) / DE
Application number, filing date09749539.430.04.2009
[2011/08]
WO2009EP03143
Priority number, dateDE20082006986U23.05.2008         Original published format: DE 202008006986 U
[2011/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009141049
Date:26.11.2009
Language:DE
[2009/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2285612
Date:23.02.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2285612
Date:03.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60J10/02
[2011/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2011/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PROFILELEMENT ZUM VERBINDEN EINER FAHRZEUGSCHEIBE MIT EINEM WASSERKASTEN[2011/08]
English:PROFILE ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A VEHICLE PANE WITH A COWL[2015/04]
French:ELÉMENT DE PROFIL DESTINÉ À RELIER UNE PLAQUE DE VÉHICULE À UNE GRILLE D'AUVENT[2015/04]
Former [2011/08]PROFILE ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A VEHICLE PANE TO A WATER TANK
Former [2011/08]ÉLÉMENT PROFILÉ POUR CONNECTER UNE VITRE D'UN VÉHICULE À UN COLLECTEUR D'EAU
Entry into regional phase22.12.2010National basic fee paid 
22.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/08]
31.05.2013Observations by third parties
26.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2015Fee for grant paid
10.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.02.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Gebauer, Dieter Edmund
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstraße 7
80469 München / DE
 [2018/06]
Former [2016/14]
Opponent(s)01  29.02.2016   
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lendvai, Tomas
Saint-Gobain Sekurit Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Herzogenrath R&D Center - Patentabteilung Glasstrasse 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
13.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0005/18
09.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
08.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0005/18
21.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.04.2009
CY03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
AT30.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
IE30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
LU30.04.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/28]HU30.04.2009
CY03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
AT30.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
IE30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
LU30.04.2016
Former [2017/38]DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
AT30.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
IE30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
LU30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
LU30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
LU30.04.2016
Former [2016/24]DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
Former [2016/20]DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
Former [2016/10]EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[DXY]DE20008555U  (ELKAMET KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,11-20 * abstract * [Y] 2-10;
 [Y]FR2817302  (NEYR PLASTIQUES HOLDING [FR]) [Y] 2-10 * figures 1-4; claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0249560  (PROFIL SA IND FINANC LE [FR]) [A] 3 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1571069  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2006002891  (KUNSTSTOFF TECHNIK SCHERER & T [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 9, line 7 - page 12, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1724141  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE10122637  (WAGON AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] * columns 4-6; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1480058  (CITROEN SA ANDRE) [A] * figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *
by applicantDE20008555U
 WO2006002891
OppositionWO0188481
 EP1808322
 DE102004030465
 DE202005019203U
 WO2006002891
 EP1240041
 DE1480058
 DE10122637
 EP1571069
 EP0249660
 EP0836961
 EP0003968
 US5396746
 DE10322637
 FR2739060
 EP0644350
 DE8617588U
 FR2817302
 DE20008555U
 EP1724141
 JPH08240213
 DE2801640
 DE60202318T
 DE602004006432T