blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2279275

EP2279275 - BLOCK AND SHEET MADE OF STEEL WITH HIGH PROPERTIES FOR BULKY PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/05]STEEL WITH HIGH PROPERTIES FOR SOLID PARTS.
[2013/17]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2021Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 05.01.2022  [2022/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INDUSTEEL FRANCE
Immeuble "Le Cézanne"
6, rue André Campra
93200 Saint-Denis / FR
[2014/03]
Former [2011/05]For all designated states
INDUSTEEL CREUSOT
1 à 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini
93200 Saint-Dénis / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BEGUINOT, Jean
12 rue des Pyrénées
F-71200 Le Creusot / FR
02 / NGOMO, Valéry
35 rue Maréchal Leclerc
F-71200 Le Creusot / FR
 [2011/13]
Former [2011/05]01 / BEGUINOT, Jean
12 rue des Pyrénées
F-71200 Le Creusot / FR
02 / NGOMO, Valéry
5 rue de Reims
F-71200 Le Creusot / FR
Representative(s)Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/35]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2011/05]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date09750037.505.05.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009FR50822
Priority number, dateEP2008030019906.05.2008         Original published format: EP 08300199
[2011/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009141556
Date:26.11.2009
Language:FR
[2009/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2279275
Date:02.02.2011
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2279275
Date:28.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2009
ClassificationIPC:C22C38/18, C22C38/58, C22C38/22, B29C33/38
[2011/05]
CPC:
C22C38/58 (EP,KR,US); C22C38/18 (KR); B29C33/38 (EP,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US); C21D6/005 (EP,US); C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/0242 (US); C21D8/0263 (EP,US); C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US); C22C38/04 (US); C22C38/22 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/44 (US); C22C38/46 (US); C22C38/60 (KR);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US); C21D9/0081 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/05]
Extension statesAL15.09.2010
BA15.09.2010
RS15.09.2010
TitleGerman:BLOCK ODER BLECH AUS STAHL MIT HOHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN FÜR MASSIVE TEILE[2013/17]
English:BLOCK AND SHEET MADE OF STEEL WITH HIGH PROPERTIES FOR BULKY PARTS[2013/17]
French:BLOC OU TOLE EN ACIER À HAUTES CARACTÉRISTIQUES POUR PIÈCES MASSIVES[2013/17]
Former [2011/05]STAHL MIT HOHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN FÜR FESTE TEILE
Former [2011/05]STEEL WITH HIGH PROPERTIES FOR SOLID PARTS.
Former [2011/05]ACIER À HAUTES CARACTÉRISTIQUES POUR PIÈCES MASSIVES
Entry into regional phase15.09.2010National basic fee paid 
15.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
27.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2013Fee for grant paid
18.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.05.2014  30.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Uddeholms AB
683 85 Hagfors / SE
Opponent's representative
Noréns Patentbyrå AB
Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
 [2022/01]
Former [2014/27]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2014    ADMISSIBLE
Uddeholms AB
683 85 Hagfors / SE
Opponent's representative
Johansson, Lars E.
Hynell Patenttjänst AB
P.O. Box 138
683 23 Hagfors / SE
07.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/22]
15.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.05.2009
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE05.05.2014
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2019/38]
Former [2017/40]HU05.05.2009
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE05.05.2014
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE05.05.2014
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE05.05.2014
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU05.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU05.05.2014
Former [2014/23]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/21]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/12]FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/10]HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO28.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO28.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE651845  (BOEHLER & CO AKT GES GEB) [X] 1-10 * claim 1 *;
 [X]FR2241624  (INT NICKEL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 26-29; claims 9,10 *;
 [A]US5139737  (SUDO KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-12 *;
 [X]JPH06184695  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]US5759299  (YOKOYAMA HIROYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0882808  (THYSSEN FRANCE SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US5855845  (BEGUINOT JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1-20 *;
 [A]JP2001294973  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005115644  (BEGUINOT JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-11; tables 1,2 *
by applicantFR2241624
 US5759299
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.