blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2279645

EP2279645 - ENHANCING POWER EFFICIENCY IN A WIRELESS INTERNET CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Blvd. M/S: RNB4-150
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NOAH, Moshe
Ha-zofim 26
20692 Yokneam / IL
02 / LIVINI, Jonathan
24 Zamenhot Street
64373 Tel Aviv / IL
03 / FRIEDLANDER, Eran
Hazofim 1
76100 Rehovot / IL
 [2011/05]
Representative(s)HGF
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield
South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date09751120.830.04.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009US42400
Priority number, dateUS2008012402620.05.2008         Original published format: US 124026
[2011/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2009142891
Date:26.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2279645
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:H04W88/02, H04W52/02, H04W84/10
[2011/05]
CPC:
H04W52/028 (EP,US); H04W52/0251 (EP,US); Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/05]
TitleGerman:ERHÖHUNG DER LEISTUNGSEFFIZIENZ IN EINER DRAHTLOSEN INTERNETKARTE[2011/05]
English:ENHANCING POWER EFFICIENCY IN A WIRELESS INTERNET CARD[2011/05]
French:AMÉLIORATION DU RENDEMENT DE PUISSANCE DANS UNE CARTE INTERNET SANS FIL[2011/05]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2010National basic fee paid 
15.09.2010Search fee paid 
15.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
23.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
13.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201810   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007135162  (BANERJEA RAJA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0093] * * figure 1 * * figure 5 * * figure 11B * [I] 2,8;
 [A]US2004048577  (GODFREY TIMOTHY GORDON [US], et al) [A] 2,8 * figure 6 *
International search[A]US2005059347  (HAARTSEN JACOBUS C [NL]);
 [A]US7340236  (LIANG JIE [US], et al);
 [A]US7072616  (GODFREY TIMOTHY GORDON [US]);
 [A]US6842607  (GODFREY TIMOTHY GORDON [US], et al);
 [A]US2006292986  (BITRAN YIGAL [IL], et al)
by applicantUS2007135162
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.