blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2346819

EP2346819 - NAPHTHYLACETIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Li
Dongjiao State Guest Hotel A18
No. 1800 Jinke Road
Shanghai 201203 / CN
02 / FIROOZNIA, Fariborz
9 Pierson Lane
Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US
03 / GILLESPIE, Paul
739 Tamaques Way
Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US
04 / HE, Yun
1298 Kangqiao Road
99 Nanhui District
Shanghai 201315 / CN
05 / LIN, Tai-An
83 Mandeville Avenue
Pequannock New Jersey 07440 / US
06 / MERTZ, Eric
5-25 3rd Street
Fair Lawn New Jersey 07410 / US
07 / SO, Sung-Sau
11 Westover Road
Verona New Jersey 07044 / US
08 / YUN, HongYing
802 Yinghua Road
Bldg. 1, Aprt. 202
Shanghai 201204 / CN
09 / ZHANG, Zhenshan
667 Zi Wei Road
Building 139
Apt 1002
Pudong
Shanghai 201203 / CN
 [2013/15]
Former [2011/30]01 / CHEN, Li
Dongjiao State Guest Hotel A18 No. 1800 Jinke Road
Shanghai 201203 / CN
02 / FIROOZNIA, Fariborz
9 Pierson Lane
Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US
03 / GILLESPIE, Paul
739 Tamaques Way
Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US
04 / HE, Yun
1298 Kangqiao Road 99 Nanhui District
Shanghai 201315 / CN
05 / LIN, Tai-An
83 Mandeville Avenue
Pequannock New Jersey 07440 / US
06 / MERTZ, Eric
5-25 3rd Street
Fair Lawn New Jersey 07410 / US
07 / SO, Sung-Sau
11 Westover Road
Verona New Jersey 07044 / US
08 / YUN, HongYing
802 Yinghua Road Bldg. 1, Aprt. 202
Shanghai 201204 / CN
09 / ZHANG, Zhenshan
667 Zi Wei Road Building 139 Apt 1002 Pudong
Shanghai 201203 / CN
Representative(s)Salud, Carlos E.
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Salud, Carlos E.
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Former [2011/30]Salud, Carlos E.
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date09751894.809.11.2009
[2011/30]
WO2009EP64810
Priority number, dateUS20080115133P17.11.2008         Original published format: US 115133 P
US20090222182P01.07.2009         Original published format: US 222182 P
[2011/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2010055004
Date:20.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2346819
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2346819
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:C07C317/14, C07C317/22, C07C317/36, C07D213/71, C07D295/26, A61K31/435, A61K31/185, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P37/00, A61P11/00
[2011/30]
CPC:
C07D213/71 (EP,KR,US); C07C317/46 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/185 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/02 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/04 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP); C07C255/54 (EP,US); C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07C317/22 (EP,US); C07C317/36 (EP,US); C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C323/65 (EP,US); C07D211/38 (EP,US); C07D295/26 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US); C07C2601/02 (EP,US); C07C2601/08 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/30]
Extension statesRS17.06.2011
TitleGerman:NAPHTHYLESSIGSÄUREN[2011/30]
English:NAPHTHYLACETIC ACIDS[2011/30]
French:ACIDES NAPHTYLACÉTIQUES[2011/30]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2011National basic fee paid 
17.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
23.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2012Fee for grant paid
03.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2012
Opposition(s)13.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
01.03.2013Request for further processing filed
01.03.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.03.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMK10.04.2013
SM10.04.2013
IS10.08.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2015/24]SM10.04.2013
IS10.08.2013
Former [2013/48]IS10.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[IA]EP1939175  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [I] 1-15,23-24 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0005] , [ 0068] * * claims 1, 5, 27, 31-34 *[A] 16-22
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.