Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2376347

EP2376347 - METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AN EASY OPEN CAN END [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crown Packaging Technology, Inc.
11535 S. Central Avenue
Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US
[2011/42]
Inventor(s)01 / PAILLET, Laure, Helene, Marie
61B Wilkins Road
Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2HZ / GB
02 / WILSON, Alastair
11 Belmont
Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9AS / GB
03 / HALL, Jason, John
11 Summerside Road
Buckland Oxfordshire SN7 8QY / GB
 [2012/51]
Former [2011/42]01 / PAILLET, Laure, Helene, Marie
61B Wilkins Road
Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2HZ / GB
02 / WILSON, Alastair
11 Belmont
Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9AS / GB
03 / HALL, Jason, John
11 Summerside Road
Buckland Oxfordshire SN7 8QY / GB
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/42]Ratliff, Ismay Hilary
Crown Packaging UK PLC Group Intellectual Property Downsview Road Wantage
Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB
Application number, filing date09752342.709.11.2009
WO2009EP64853
Priority number, dateUS20080113490P11.11.2008         Original published format: US 113490 P
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010055014
Date:20.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2376347
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2376347
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:B65D79/00
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:APPLIKATIONS-METHODE FÜR EIN LEICHT ZU ÖFFNENDES DOSENENDE[2012/49]
English:METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AN EASY OPEN CAN END[2011/42]
French:PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE EXTREMITE DE BOITE A OUVERTURE FACILE[2012/51]
Former [2011/42]VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES LEICHT ZU ?FFNENDEN DOSENENDES
Former [2011/42]PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE EXTRÉMITÉ DE BOÎTE À OUVERTURE FACILE
Entry into regional phase08.06.2011National basic fee paid 
08.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
27.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2013Fee for grant paid
19.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014   
Ardagh MP Group Netherlands B.V.
Zutphenseweg 51
7418 AH Deventer / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014   
Ardagh MP Group Netherlands B.V.
Zutphenseweg 51
7418 AH Deventer / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
16.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1203/16
28.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1203/16
21.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MK12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
LU09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MK12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
LU09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/32]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MK12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/30]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/24]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE09.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1958882  (IMPRESS GROUP BV [NL]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2A,2B *;
 [XA]WO03104092  (MAEIL DAIRY INDUSTRY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph L * [A] 6;
 [A]US5169017  (COOPER TERRY [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 5, line 14 - line 25 *;
 [A]WO9714614  (DIAMOND GEORGE B [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 1a-1d,2a-2d,3; claim 9 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, line L * * page 7, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2 *
OppositionWO2008098761
 WO9714614
 US4266688