Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2355652

EP2355652 - Method and device for automatically bringing a fluid into contact with the teats of an animal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/33]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY BRINGING A FLUID INTO CONTACT WITH THE TEATS OF AN ANIMAL
[2013/24]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Farm Technologies GmbH
Siemensstrasse 25-27
59199 Bönen / DE
[2011/33]
Inventor(s)01 / WILMERT, Wolfgang, Schulze
Am Berge 24
48599 Gronau-Epe / DE
02 / FRENSER, Reinhard
Braunholzstrasse 51
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
03 / AUSTERMANN, Michael
Hugo-Merten-Weg 6
59387 Ascheberg / DE
04 / THEIS, Christelle
Am Westhang 7
58640 Iserlohn / DE
05 / TORGERSON, Kevin, L.
N7945 Flaten Road
Holmen WI 54636 / US
 [2011/33]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/40]
Former [2011/33]Specht, Peter
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date09752529.909.11.2009
[2011/33]
WO2009US06026
Priority number, dateUS20080198839P10.11.2008         Original published format: US 198839 P
[2011/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010053577
Date:14.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2355652
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010
[2011/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2355652
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/04
[2011/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen inkontaktbringen eines Fluids mit den Zitzen eines Tieres[2013/24]
English:Method and device for automatically bringing a fluid into contact with the teats of an animal[2013/24]
French:Procédé et dispositif de mise en contact automatique d'un fluide avec les tétines d'un animal[2013/24]
Former [2011/33]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN INKONTAKTBRINGEN EINES FLUIDS MIT DEN ZITZEN EINES TIERES
Former [2011/33]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY BRINGING A FLUID INTO CONTACT WITH THE TEATS OF AN ANIMAL
Former [2011/33]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN CONTACT AUTOMATIQUE D'UN FLUIDE AVEC LES TÉTINES D'UN ANIMAL
Entry into regional phase07.06.2011National basic fee paid 
07.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/33]
28.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2014Fee for grant paid
10.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.06.2015   
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Gray, Helen Mary, et al
Zacco GmbH
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 [2015/32]
17.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1874/17
06.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.11.2009
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU09.11.2009
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU09.11.2009
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/28]AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/22]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/12]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/51]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/48]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB01.01.2015
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
IE09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/33]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/32]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1520469  (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [X] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0087] - [0094] - [0096] , [0097] , [0106] , [0107] *;
 [A]US5881669  (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,12,16-17 * abstract * * column 2, lines 44-60 * * column 5, lines 9-23 * * column 6, lines 21-57 * * column 7, lines 24-65 *;
 [AD]WO2006029797  (WESTFALIASURGE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1,16 * abstract *;
 [AD]US7401573  (TORGERSON KEVIN L [US]) [AD] 1,16 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 18 *
by applicantWO2006029797
 EP1520469