Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2293689

EP2293689 - FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2014
Database last updated on 15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2014  [2014/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mars, Incorporated
6885 Elm Street
McLean, VA 22101-3383 / US
[2011/11]
Inventor(s)01 / MCGENITY, Philip, Martin
Mars Petcare UK Ltd 3D Dundee Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4LG / GB
02 / BAILLON, Marie-Louise
Mars Petcare UK Ltd 3D Dundee Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4LG / GB
03 / NEWTON, Andrew
Mars Petcare UK Ltd 3D Dundee Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4LG / GB
 [2011/11]
Representative(s)Care, Alison , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Care, Alison , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date09754103.128.05.2009
[2011/11]
WO2009GB01330
Priority number, dateGB2008000966528.05.2008         Original published format: GB 0809665
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009144458
Date:03.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2293689
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009
[2011/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/00, A23K1/14, A23K1/18, A23L1/30
[2011/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/11]
TitleGerman:NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKT[2011/11]
English:FOOD PRODUCT[2011/11]
French:PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE[2011/11]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2010National basic fee paid 
07.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/11]
06.03.2013Observations by third parties
22.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/37]
30.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO0003606  (MARS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9-15 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * [I] 1-15,17;
 [X]US2007134402  (FEDER DAVID P [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-42 *;
 [I]WO2008010188  (AD MED BIOTECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [I] 11-15 * page 10, paragraph 38 * * page 32 * * claims 1-8 *;
 [XP]WO2008065382  (MARS UK LTD [GB], et al) [XP] 1 * page 7 - paragraph 5 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 6 * * examples 8-10 * * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]  ROMANI A ET AL, "Identification and quantitation of polyphenols in leaves of Myrtus communis L", CHROMATOGRAPHIA, WIESBADEN, DE, (19990101), vol. 49, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-5893, pages 17 - 20, XP002461977 [A] 1,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02467181
 [A]  AYDIN ET AL, "Determination of nutritional and physical properties of myrtle (Myrtus communis L.) fruits growing wild in Turkey", JOURNAL OF FOOD ENGINEERING, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (20061101), vol. 79, no. 2, ISSN 0260-8774, pages 453 - 458, XP005844950 [A] 1,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2006.02.008
 [A]  APPENDINO G ET AL, "Antibacterial galloylated alkylphloroglucinol glucosides from myrtle (Myrtus communis)", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, INDIA - NEW DELHI, (20060601), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0250-4367, XP018018747 [A] 1,17 * the whole document *
other   - "Aab-e- Habb-ul- Aas Qulaai", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH4/268J1, XP003029662
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, vol. II, page 118,
    - "Nushka-e- Rubb", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/17C, XP003029663
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, vol. XX, page 17,
    - "Dawa E Bakhr Deegar", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/720, XP003029664
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Quaraabaadeen Quaadri, page 109,
    - "Sharaab -e- Habb Ul Aas", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. WA1/51AH, XP003029665
    - ZIYA AL- DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL- BAITAR, Al-Jaam'e-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Aghzia, vol. I, page 29,
    - "Mazmazah Bajhr-al Fam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/998D, XP003029666
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Quaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 166 - 167,
    - "Nuskha Mazmaza", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/1043A, XP003029667
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Quaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, page 174,