Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2285323

EP2285323 - SUPER-ABSORBENT, REDUCED-PRESSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/08]SUPER-ABSORBENT, REDUCED-PRESSURE WOUND DRESSING AND SYSTEMS
[2012/43]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RANDOLPH, Larry, Tab
27917 Bonn Mountain Dr.
San Antonio TX 78260 / US
02 / LONG, Justin, Alexander
6335 Mustang Point Dr.
San Antonio TX 78240 / US
 [2011/08]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Cordina, Kevin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2012/13]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2011/08]Ashton, Timothy
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09755801.929.05.2009
[2011/08]
WO2009US45743
Priority number, dateUS20080057802P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57802 P
US20080057803P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57803 P
US20080057807P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57807 P
US20080057800P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57800 P
US20080057797P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57797 P
US20080057810P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57810 P
US20080057805P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57805 P
US20080057808P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57808 P
US20090144067P12.01.2009         Original published format: US 144067 P
US20080057798P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57798 P
US20080121362P10.12.2008         Original published format: US 121362 P
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009146441
Date:03.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2285323
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2285323
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61M1/00
[2011/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:HOCHABSORBIERENDER SYSTEM MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK[2012/43]
English:SUPER-ABSORBENT, REDUCED-PRESSURE SYSTEM[2012/43]
French:SYSTÈME SUPER ABSORBANT À PRESSION RÉDUITE[2012/43]
Former [2011/08]HOCHABSORBIERENDER WUNDVERBAND MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK UND SYSTEME DAFÜR
Former [2011/08]SUPER-ABSORBENT, REDUCED-PRESSURE WOUND DRESSING AND SYSTEMS
Former [2011/08]PANSEMENT ET SYSTÈMES SUPER ABSORBANTS À PRESSION RÉDUITE
Entry into regional phase20.10.2010National basic fee paid 
20.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/08]
02.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2013Fee for grant paid
04.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13155466.9  / EP2594298
EP13169039.8  / EP2630979
EP17164507.0  / EP3231459
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.12.2013   
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2013   
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2013   
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
28.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1188/16
15.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.05.2009
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MK20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
IE29.05.2013
LU29.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MK20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
IE29.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2015/13]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE29.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE29.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/11]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/08]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/03]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/41]FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/38]FI20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/36]LT20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.03.2013
NO20.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2007078366  (HAGGSTROM KURT [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,13-18 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033] * [Y] 2-4,11-12,19;
 [Y]US2008103462  (WENZEL STUART [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] *;
 [Y]US2008119802  (RIESINGER BIRGIT [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0010] , [0011] , [0036] , [0040] *;
 [Y]US2007185426  (AMBROSIO ARCHEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0038] , [0041] , [0042] , [0054] , [0056] , [0059] *;
 [Y]US4969880  (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 9 * * column 2, line 14 - column 2, line 19 *