Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2358403

EP2358403 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS OF CONTROLLED COATING OF NANOPARTICLES ONTO MICRO-ROUGH IMPLANT SURFACES AND ASSOCIATED IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Promimic AB
Stena Center 1B
412 92 Göteborg / SE
[2011/34]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSSON, Martin
Utlandagatan 2
S-412 82 Göteborg / SE
02 / CURRIE, Fredrik
Östanvindsgatan 6a
S-417 17 Göteborg / SE
03 / KJELLIN, Per
Örnehufvudsgatan 3
S-412 59 Göteborg / SE
 [2011/34]
Representative(s)Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[2012/42]
Former [2011/34]Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik
BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09756733.319.11.2009
[2011/34]
WO2009EP65476
Priority number, dateUS2008027666424.11.2008         Original published format: US 276664
[2011/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010057949
Date:27.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2358403
Date:24.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010
[2011/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2358403
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/04, A61L27/50, C23C24/04, C23C24/08, C23C26/00, A61L27/10, A61L27/06, A61L27/32
[2012/20]
Former International [2011/34]A61L27/06, A61L27/10, A61L27/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR GESTEUERTEN BESCHICHTUNG VON NANOPARTIKELN AUF MIKRO-RAUE IMPLANTATOBERFLÄCHEN UND ZUGEORDNETE IMPLANTATE[2011/34]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS OF CONTROLLED COATING OF NANOPARTICLES ONTO MICRO-ROUGH IMPLANT SURFACES AND ASSOCIATED IMPLANTS[2011/34]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR LE DÉPÔT CONTRÔLÉ DE NANOPARTICULES SUR DES SURFACES D IMPLANT MICRORUGUEUSES, ET IMPLANTS ASSOCIÉS[2011/34]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2011National basic fee paid 
17.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
27.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2012Fee for grant paid
17.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2012
Opposition(s)18.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.11.2009
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MK17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/34]HU19.11.2009
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2014/27]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2014/21]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/51]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/47]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
IE19.11.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/46]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006134160  (TROCZYNSKI TOMASZ [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,10,11,13-15,17-19,23,24,26,27,29 * claims 1-36 *;
 [I]WO2005123579  (PROMIMIC AB [SE], et al) [I] 2,6,7,9,12,16,20-22,25,28,30-36 * claims 1-19 *;
 [A]WO2007059038  (IMPLANT INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * claims 1-59 *;
 [A]WO2005000373  (CHEMAT TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * claims 1-31 *