Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2396284

EP2396284 - METHOD OF REDUCING REDOX RATIO OF MOLTEN GLASS FOR MAKING ULTRA-CLEAR GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/51]METHOD OF REDUCING REDOX RATIO OF MOLTEN GLASS AND ULTRA-CLEAR GLASS MADE THEREBY
[2015/51]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.08.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vitro, S.A.B. de C.V.
Av. Ricardo Margain Zozaya No. 400
Col. Valle del Campestre
San Pedro Garza Garcia
Nuevo León, México 66265 / MX
[2017/09]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Former [2011/51]For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHELESTAK, Larry, J.
201 Spruce Street
P. O. Box 233
Bairdford, PA 15006 / US
02 / SCHWENNINGER, Ronald, L.
3247 Hampton Oaks Drive
Allison Park PA 15101 / US
 [2016/20]
Former [2011/51]01 / SHELESTAK, Larry, J.
201 Spruce Street
P. O. Box 233
Bairdford, PA15006 / US
02 / SCHWENNINGER, Ronald, L.
3247 Hampton Oaks Drive
Allison Park PA 15101 / US
Representative(s)f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2016/20]
Former [2013/22]polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/51]Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date09756894.316.11.2009
[2016/20]
WO2009US64557
Priority number, dateUS2008027526421.11.2008         Original published format: US 275264
[2011/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010059559
Date:27.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2396284
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010
[2011/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2396284
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:C03B5/173, C03B5/193, C03B5/235, C03C3/087, C03C4/10
[2011/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES REDOXVERHÄLTNISSES VON GESCHMOLZENEM GLAS ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCH TRANSPARENTEN GLASES[2015/51]
English:METHOD OF REDUCING REDOX RATIO OF MOLTEN GLASS FOR MAKING ULTRA-CLEAR GLASS[2015/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DIMINUTION DU REDOX DU VERRE FONDU POUR OBTENIR UN VERRE EXTRA CLAIR[2015/51]
Former [2011/51]VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES REDOXVERHÄLTNISSES VON GESCHMOLZENEM GLAS UND DADURCH HERGESTELLTES ULTRAREINES GLAS
Former [2011/51]METHOD OF REDUCING REDOX RATIO OF MOLTEN GLASS AND ULTRA-CLEAR GLASS MADE THEREBY
Former [2011/51]PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DU RAPPORT REDOX DE VERRE FONDU ET VERRE ULTRA TRANSPARENT OBTENU PAR CE PROCÉDÉ
Entry into regional phase18.05.2011National basic fee paid 
18.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
18.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2013Observations by third parties
26.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2016Fee for grant paid
04.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.2017   
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 COURBEVOIE / FR
Opponent's representative
Saint-Gobain Recherche
Département Propriété Industrielle
39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
 [2017/13]
Former [2017/11]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2017   
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 COURBEVOIE / FR
23.03.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
22.08.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.08.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2527/18
19.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.11.2009
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE16.11.2016
MT16.11.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/38]HU16.11.2009
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE16.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU16.11.2009
AT18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE16.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU16.11.2009
AT18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE16.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE16.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2009115725  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]; PEDEBOSCQ PHILIPPE [FR]; MARTIN DOROTHEE [FR]; CINT) [XP] 1-5,19-22 * page 11, line 23 - line 33 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 18 * * examples 2-4 *;
 [XY]US2008085827  (THOMSEN SCOTT V [US] ET AL THOMSEN SCOTT V [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5 * examples 1, 4 and 5 of figure 1, clear and PPG Starphire glasses; paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; figure 1 * [Y] 14-17,20-21;
 [XY]EP1281687  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0046]; examples 1-7 * [Y] 14-17,20-21;
 [XY]EP1291330  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009]; table 2 * * Table 5 (ex. 1-6) and Table 6 (ex. 7) * [Y] 14-17,20-21;
 [X]EP1201615  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * examples 1,2,4,5 *;
 [X]WO2007106226  (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US]; THOMSEN SCOTT V [US]; HULME RICHARD [US]; LA) [X] 1-5 * example 1 of fig.2, regular clear, extra clear and Starfire glasses of Fig. 2;; figure 2 *;
 [XYI]US4634461  (DEMAREST JR HENRY M [US] ET AL) [X] 6,18 * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 66; figure 2 * * column 13, lines 20-22 * [Y] 14-18,20-21 [I] 7-13,19,22;
 [XYI]US4599100  (DEMAREST JR HENRY M [US]) [X] 6 * column 5, lines 36-60; figure 2 * [Y] 14-18 [I] 7-13
ExaminationWO2010056432
 WO2010023419
 US2002092325
 US7217673
OppositionWO2007106226
 JP2007238398
 EP1281687
 WO9931021
 WO2007007012
 FR2903397
 US2002092325
 WO2007018910
 US4634461