EP2296914 - A DECORATIVE SUBSTRATE, ESPECIALLY AN ARTIFICIAL JEWELLERY STONE WITH A COLOUR EFFECT AND METHOD FOR ACHIEVING THE COLOUR EFFECT FOR A TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preciosa, A.S. Opletalova 3197 466 67 Jablonec nad Nisou / CZ | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREJCI, Radomir Radova 424 463 03 Straz n.Nisou / CZ | 02 /
PETRYDES, David 468 03 Rádlo 300 / CZ | 03 /
NEKVINDA, Milan Matousova 48 460 02 Liberec / CZ | [2011/50] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
KREJCI, Radomir Radova 424 463 03 Straz n.Nisou / CZ | ||
02 /
PETRYDES, David 468 03 Rádlo 300 / CZ | |||
03 /
NEKVINDA, Milan Matousova 48 460 02 Liberec / CZ | Representative(s) | Pavlica, Tomas H&P Patents s.r.o. Na Florenci 1332/23 110 00 Praha 1 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Pavlica, Tomas Traplová, Hakr, Kubát Law and Patent Offices Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | ||
Former [2011/12] | Pavlica, Tomas Traplová, Hakr, Kubát Law and Patent Offices Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 09757100.4 | 01.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009CZ00075 | Priority number, date | CZ20080000339 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: CZ 20080339 | [2011/12] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009146666 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2296914 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2296914 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B44F1/04, A44C17/00, B44C5/04, B44C5/06, C03C17/36 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B44F1/045 (EP,US);
A44C17/00 (EP,US);
A44C27/006 (EP,US);
B44C5/0407 (EP,US);
B44C5/06 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3607 (EP,US);
C03C17/3642 (EP,US);
C03C17/3644 (EP,US);
C03C17/3649 (EP,US);
C03C2217/72 (EP,US);
C03C2218/154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | ZIERSUBSTRAT, INSBESONDERE KÜNSTLICHER SCHMUCKSTEIN MIT FARBEFFEKT, UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZIELEN DES FARBEFFEKTS FÜR EIN TRANSPARENTES SUBSTRAT | [2011/12] | English: | A DECORATIVE SUBSTRATE, ESPECIALLY AN ARTIFICIAL JEWELLERY STONE WITH A COLOUR EFFECT AND METHOD FOR ACHIEVING THE COLOUR EFFECT FOR A TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE | [2011/12] | French: | SUBSTRAT DÉCORATIF, EN PARTICULIER GEMME DE VERRE, AVEC UN EFFET DE COULEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE L'EFFET DE COULEUR DANS LE SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2009 | BE | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | HR | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MK | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | NO | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | IE | 01.06.2012 | LU | 01.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
LU | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NO | 14.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4204763 (FRAUNHOFER GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 2, lines 41-54; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004053068 (SCHICHT HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0020] - [0023] *; | [AD]US2004083759 (STARCKE STEVEN F [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0031] - [0039] - [0049] , [0050] * |