Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2359110

EP2359110 - DEVICE FOR ANALYSING MATERIALS BY PLASMA SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bertin Technologies
10 bis, Avenue Ampère Parc d'Activités du Pas du Lac
78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR
[2011/34]
Inventor(s)01 / SENAC Stéphane
164 RD 46-route de Châteauneuf-le-Rouge
13100 Beaurecueil / FR
 [2017/17]
Former [2011/34]01 / SENAC Stéphane
26A avenue de la Libération
F - 13850 Greasque / FR
Representative(s)Pichat, Thierry , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]Ramey, Daniel , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2011/34]Ramey, Daniel , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date09759753.803.11.2009
[2011/34]
WO2009FR01272
Priority number, dateFR2008000671228.11.2008         Original published format: FR 0806712
[2011/34]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010061069
Date:03.06.2010
Language:FR
[2010/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2359110
Date:24.08.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010
[2011/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2359110
Date:26.04.2017
Language:FR
[2017/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/443, G01N21/27, G01N21/71
[2011/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2011/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM ANALYSIEREN VON MATERIALIEN DURCH PLASMASPEKTROSKOPIE[2011/34]
English:DEVICE FOR ANALYSING MATERIALS BY PLASMA SPECTROSCOPY[2011/34]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE MATERIAUX PAR SPECTROSCOPIE DE PLASMA[2011/34]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2011National basic fee paid 
25.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
04.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2017Fee for grant paid
16.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2016
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2009
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE03.11.2017
LU03.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU03.11.2009
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE03.11.2017
LU03.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU03.11.2009
AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE03.11.2017
LU03.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE03.11.2017
LU03.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE03.11.2017
LU03.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
LU03.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
LU03.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005229698  (BEECROFT MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0061] - [0066] * * figures 8,9 *;
 [A]  - FICHET P ET AL, "DETERMINATION OF IMPURITIES IN URANIUM AND PLUTONIUM DIOXIDES BY LASER-INDUCED BREAKDOWN SPECTROSCOPY", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, THE SOCIETY FOR APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. BALTIMORE, US, (19990901), vol. 53, no. 9, ISSN 0003-7028, pages 1111 - 1117, XP000903103 [A] 1-17 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/0003702991947892