Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2356342

EP2356342 - PANEL-FASTENING CLIPS, ESPECIALLY FOR CURTAIN OR LATERAL AIRBAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.07.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITW Metal Fasteners SL
Paseo Can Feu 60-66
08205 Sabadell (Barcelona) / ES
[2011/33]
Inventor(s)01 / RIBES MARTÍ, Óscar
Agustina d ́Aragó 16, 4º 6ª
E-08203 Sabadell Barcelona / ES
 [2011/33]
Representative(s)Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Canela Giménez, Teresa
C/Girona no 148, 1o 2a
08037 Barcelona / ES
Former [2011/33]Canela Giménez, Teresa
C/Girona no 148, 1o 2a
08037 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date09760610.712.11.2009
[2011/33]
WO2009IB55046
Priority number, dateES2008000333217.11.2008         Original published format: ES 200803332
[2011/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010055485
Date:20.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2356342
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010
[2011/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2356342
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/06, F16B37/04, B60R21/213
[2011/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLATTENBEFESTIGUNGSCLIP INSBESONDERE FÜR SEITENAIRBAGS ODER VORHANGAIRBAGS[2014/32]
English:PANEL-FASTENING CLIPS, ESPECIALLY FOR CURTAIN OR LATERAL AIRBAGS[2011/33]
French:CLIP DE FIXATION DE PANNEAU NOTAMMENT POUR AIRBAGS DE TYPE RIDEAU OU LATÉRAL[2014/33]
Former [2011/33]PLATTENBEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMERN, INSBESONDERE FÜR VORHANG- ODER SEITENAIRBAGS
Former [2011/33]ATTACHES DE FIXATION DE PANNEAU, EN PARTICULIER POUR COUSSINS DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLES À RIDEAU OU LATÉRAUX
Entry into regional phase13.06.2011National basic fee paid 
13.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/33]
30.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.09.2014Fee for grant paid
11.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.07.2015   
A. Raymond et Cie. SCS
111-113 et 115, cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Opponent's representative
Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/36]
01.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2149/17
23.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201305   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IT12.11.2017
PL12.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
[2019/22]
Former [2018/49]HU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IT12.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
Former [2018/47]HU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IT12.11.2017
Former [2018/30]HU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/33]HU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU12.11.2009
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/28]AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/22]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/12]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/48]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB22.01.2015
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE12.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/33]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT22.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1138962  (EMHART INC [US]) [X] 1-2,4 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4,6,7,15 * * column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 38 - line 42 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * [Y] 3,5,7;
 [XY]US6095734  (POSTADAN REYNALDO M [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4,6 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 3,5,7;
 [XY]GB2162272  (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1-2,4 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,5,7;
 [Y]DE102006019256  (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]) [Y] 3,5,7 * column 16 * * figures 1-4 *