Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2364512

EP2364512 - A BOILER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU, MC, MK
published on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House, Foundry Lane Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / DEVRIENDT, James
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House
Foundry Lane
Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
02 / EVANS, Christopher John
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House
Foundry Lane
Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
03 / MORGAN, Robert
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House
Foundry Lane
Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
04 / BARNARD, Paul
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House
Foundry Lane
Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
05 / GIRVAN, Bruce
Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited
Viking House
Foundry Lane
Horsham
West Sussex RH13 5PX / GB
 [2015/43]
Former [2011/37]01 / DEVRIENDT, James
Unit 18
Denvale Trade Park
Haslett Avenue East
Crawley
West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB
02 / EVANS, Christopher John
Unit 18
Denvale Trade Park
Haslett Avenue East
Crawley
West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB
03 / MORGAN, Robert
Unit 18
Denvale Trade Park
Haslett Avenue East
Crawley
West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB
04 / BARNARD, Paul
Unit 18
Denvale Trade Park
Haslett Avenue East
Crawley
West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB
05 / GIRVAN, Bruce
Unit 18
Denvale Trade Park
Haslett Avenue East
Crawley
West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB
Representative(s)Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2013/29]Robertson, James Alexander , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2012/08]Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2011/37]Lloyd, Robin
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date09760965.526.11.2009
[2016/01]
WO2009GB02760
Priority number, dateGB2008002170027.11.2008         Original published format: GB 0821700
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010061190
Date:03.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2364512
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2364512
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:F24H9/14, F24H1/00, F24H1/08, F24H1/22, F24D12/02, F24H9/06, F24H9/20
[2015/30]
Former International [2011/37]H01M8/00, F24H9/20, F24H9/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BOILER-EINHEIT[2011/37]
English:A BOILER UNIT[2011/37]
French:UNITÉ DE CHAUDIÈRE[2011/37]
Entry into regional phase08.06.2011National basic fee paid 
08.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/37]
18.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2015Fee for grant paid
06.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.11.2009
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
[2018/28]
Former [2017/15]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE10111072  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15,18,20,22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0009] , [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 16,17 [I] 7,11,12,19;
 [Y]EP1835240  (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 16,17 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2004101982  (MICROGEN ENERGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-20,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10000406  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-20,22 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1030123  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011]; figure 1; claim 4 *