Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2296891

EP2296891 - DEVICE FOR COLD FOIL EMBOSSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, LU
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
manroland sheetfed GmbH
Mühlheimer Straße 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
[2013/08]
Former [2011/12]For all designated states
Manroland AG
Mühlheimer Straße 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PÜSCHEL, Uwe
Berndes-Allee 42
55262 Heidesheim / DE
02 / RESCHKE, Guido
Drosselweg 11
65597 Hünfelden-Ohren / DE
03 / SCHÖLZIG, Jürgen
Am Eiskeller 3
55126 Mainz / DE
 [2011/12]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2018/42]
Former [2014/26]Stahl, Dietmar
manroland sheetfed GmbH
Intellectual Property (SRI)
Mühlheimerstrasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date09761592.625.05.2009
[2011/12]
WO2009EP56291
Priority number, dateDE2008100204728.05.2008         Original published format: DE102008002047
[2015/35]
Former [2011/12]DE2008100204728.05.2008
DE2009102643825.05.2009
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009150029
Date:17.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2296891
Date:23.03.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009
[2011/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2296891
Date:17.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B41F19/00, B41F19/06
[2011/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/42]
Former [2011/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM KALTFOLIENPRÄGEN[2011/12]
English:DEVICE FOR COLD FOIL EMBOSSING[2011/12]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GAUFRAGE DE FEUILLES À FROID[2011/12]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2010National basic fee paid 
28.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/12]
28.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2018Fee for grant paid
31.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2015
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Stay/Interruption01.02.2012Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2012/12]
02.01.2013Resumption of proceedings[2012/46]
01.02.2012Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2012/46]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
MC17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SI17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
LU25.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/07]CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
MC17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SI17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/50]CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SI17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/40]CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/37]CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/35]CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/34]DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/26]ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2005100025  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13 * page 2, lines 12,13,20,23-30 * * page 3, lines 1-8,27-29; figure 1 * * page 4, lines 3-6 * * page 7, lines 5,17,27; claim 4 * * page 8, lines 5-11 * [Y] 5-7,14,15;
 [Y]EP0987205  (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) [Y] 5-7,14,15 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [XY]EP1688252  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0016] , [0018]; figure 1 * [Y] 5-7,14,15;
 [YA]EP0858888  (GIETZ AG MASCHF [CH]) [Y] 5-7,14,15 * column 3, lines 33-42; figure 1 * * column 7, lines 7-25; figures 1,8 * * column 8, lines 10-17 * [A] 1-4;
 [XY]EP1676703  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015]; figure 1 * [Y] 4-7,10-15;
 [Y]US5611272  (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) [Y] 4-7,10-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10163762  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *;
 [E]EP2100735  (VINFOIL B V [NL]) [E] 1-3,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0045] , [0052] , [0055] , [0056]; figure 2 *
by applicantEP0569520
 WO2005100025
 EP0987205