Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2304674

EP2304674 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FACILITATING MOBILE RETAIL ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guestlogix, Inc.
111 Peter Street, Suite 302
Toronto, Ontario M5V 2H1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2011/14]For all designated states
Guestlogix, Inc.
111 Peter Street, Suite 302
Toronto, M5V 2H1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / PROUD, Brett
Guestlogix Inc. 111 Peter Street Suite 302
Toronto, ON M5V 2H1 / CA
02 / ALDOMAR, José, Manuel
GuestLogix Inc. 111 Peter Street Suite 302
Toronto, ON M5V2H1 / CA
03 / HANNA, Ramez
Guestlogix Inc. 111 Peter Street Suite 302
Toronto, ON M5V 2H1 / CA
 [2011/14]
Representative(s)Grimm, Christian
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/14]Grimm, Christian
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date09763475.209.06.2009
[2011/14]
WO2009US46798
Priority number, dateUS2008006007109.06.2008         Original published format: US 60071
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009152185
Date:17.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2304674
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/06, G06Q50/00, G06F15/16, G07G1/14, G06Q20/20, G07G1/00
[2013/11]
Former International [2011/14]G06Q30/00, G06Q50/00, G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/14]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON MOBIL-EINZELHANDELSUMGEBUNGEN[2011/14]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FACILITATING MOBILE RETAIL ENVIRONMENTS[2011/14]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À FACILITER LE FONCTIONNEMENT DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DE POINTS DE VENTE MOBILES[2011/14]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2010National basic fee paid 
21.12.2010Search fee paid 
21.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/14]
09.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
10.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201204   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]  Guestlogix, "GuestLogix to Present at the Ancillary Revenue Airline Conference 2007 in Frankfurt", (20071031), URL: http://www.guestlogix.com/pr/pr_10-31-07.html, (20130130), XP002691274 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  GuestLogix, (20080224), On-Board Sales are Taking Off Participate in the Greatest Channel Ever Created!, URL: http://guestlogix.com/pdf/Guestlogix_Partner_Marketing_LTR.pdf, (20130130), XP002691276 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  GuestLogix, "On-Board Retailing 2.0", (20080108), URL: http://ancillary2.com/pdf/GuestLogix%20On-Board%20Retailing%202.0%20WP.pdf, (20130130), XP002691275 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2003023456  (DILOLLO MICHAEL R [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2004210450  (ATENCIO MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US2008132212  (LEMOND ERIC [US], et al);
 [A]US7177826  (NISHIWAKI TAKESHI [JP], et al)