Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2300002

EP2300002 - ESCALATING DOSING REGIMEN FOR EFFECTING WEIGHT LOSS AND TREATING OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.08.2016  [2016/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vivus, Inc.
1172 Castro Street
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
[2011/13]
Inventor(s)01 / NAJARIAN, Thomas
2787 Rodman Drive
Los Osos CA 93402 / US
02 / TAM, Peter, Y.
404 Wembley Court
Redwood City CA 94061 / US
03 / WILSON, Leland, F.
164 East Creek Drive
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
 [2011/13]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2011/13]Finnie, Isobel Lara , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London
EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date09763480.209.06.2009
[2011/13]
WO2009US46805
Priority number, dateUS2008013595309.06.2008         Original published format: US 135953
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009152190
Date:17.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2300002
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP17.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/35, A61K31/137, A61P3/04
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/13]
TitleGerman:ESKALIERENDES DOSIERSCHEMA ZUR HERBEIFÜHRUNG VON GEWICHTSVERLUST UND BEHANDLUNG VON FETTSUCHT[2011/13]
English:ESCALATING DOSING REGIMEN FOR EFFECTING WEIGHT LOSS AND TREATING OBESITY[2011/13]
French:PROTOCOLE D ADMINISTRATION DE DOSES CROISSANTES VISANT À UNE PERTE DE POIDS ET À UN TRAITEMENT DE L OBÉSITÉ[2011/13]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2011National basic fee paid 
07.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/13]
12.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2013Observations by third parties
17.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.02.2016
17.02.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/34]
16.04.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.10.2014Request for further processing filed
15.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.10.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.04.2013Request for further processing filed
25.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.05.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004002462  (NAJARIAN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-30 * column 3, line 5-34; column 12, line 59 - column 15, line 6 *;
 [X]WO2006063078  (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [X] 26,27 * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 7; page 14, line 4-22; page 16, line 7-9 *;
 [X]US2007129283  (MCKINNEY ANTHONY A [US], et al) [X] 26,27 * claims 1, 8, 9, 17-19 *;
 [PX]WO2008153632  (VIVUS INC [US], et al) [PX] 26,27 * example 1 on page 39-40; example 3 on page 41; claim 1-3, 5 *
 [A]  - ROSENSTOCK J ET AL, "A randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, multicenter study to assess the efficacy and safety of topiramate controlled release in the treatment of obese type 2 diabetic patients", DIABETES CARE 200705 US, (200705), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0149-5992 0149-5992, pages 1480 - 1486, XP002538362 [A] 1-30 * page 1484-1485, paragraph entitled "Conclusions" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/dc06-2001
otherUS2004002462
 WO2006063078