Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2300002 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 971
05.07.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
15.04.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
13.04.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
06.04.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
02.02.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 72
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 13
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 12
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 8
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 262
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 44
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 8
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 3
15.01.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 12
15.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 14
29.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
22.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
22.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
15.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
15.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
15.10.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
21.08.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.01.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 71
06.11.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 16
06.11.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
06.11.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 13
06.11.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 34
14.05.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
25.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
25.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
25.04.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
11.03.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
31.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.07.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.04.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
03.03.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
02.03.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.12.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
22.10.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
17.12.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.12.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 45
18.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
29.06.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.06.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 4
29.06.2009 Description International Searching Authority 38
29.06.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 2