All documents: EP2373881  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 237
26.11.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.12.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
30.10.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
30.10.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
23.09.2013 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.2013 Description Search / examination 13
10.09.2013 Drawings Search / examination 6
10.09.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
10.09.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.09.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.06.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
31.05.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
13.05.2013 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
11.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
29.10.2012 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
03.02.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.11.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
14.09.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
19.08.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.07.2011 Annex Search / examination 3
20.07.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.07.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.07.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.06.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
29.06.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.06.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
21.06.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.04.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.04.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.04.2011 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
31.03.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
30.06.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
10.06.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
02.12.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1