Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2373881


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
17.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
03.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
28.11.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
22.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
20.12.2013 (Expected) grant published on  22.01.2014  [2014/04]
13.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.11.2013 Change - inventor published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
08.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.06.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2013 Change - German title published on  06.02.2013  [2013/06]
22.10.2012 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.08.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
01.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.01.2012 Request for examination filed published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
20.01.2012 Change - designated states published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
19.01.2012 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
14.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.09.2011 Amendment by applicant
09.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
03.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2009 PCT data prior to European publication