Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2373881

EP2373881 - METHOD OF GENERATING AND STORING HEAT IN A FLOATING VESSEL AND USING THE HEAT ONSHORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2014
Database last updated on 27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Greenheat Systems Limited
Causewayside Glenaldie Tain
Ross-shire IV19 1NE / GB
[2011/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MACKAY, Andrew
Causewayside
Glenaldie
Tain
Ross-shire IV19 1NE / GB
 [2013/51]
Former [2011/41]01 / MACKAY, Andrew
Causewayside
Glenaldie
Tain
Ross-Sshire IV19 1NE / GB
Application number, filing date09764565.902.12.2009
WO2009GB51636
Priority number, dateGB2008002199702.12.2008         Original published format: GB 0821997
[2011/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010064041
Date:10.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2373881
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2373881
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP31.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/18, F03B13/20, F03B13/26
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND SPEICHERUNG VON HITZE AUF EINEM SCHIFF UND VERWENDUNG DER HITZE AN LAND[2013/06]
English:METHOD OF GENERATING AND STORING HEAT IN A FLOATING VESSEL AND USING THE HEAT ONSHORE[2011/41]
French:MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION ET STOCKAGE DE CHALEUR DANS UN NAVIRE FLOTTANT ET L'UTILISATION DE LA CHALEUR À TERRE[2011/41]
Former [2011/41]VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND SPEICHERUNG VON WÄRME IN EINEM SCHWIMMENDEN SCHIFF UND VERWENDUNG DER WÄRME AN LAND
Entry into regional phase04.07.2011National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
11.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2013Fee for grant paid
22.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2013
Opposition(s)23.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201103   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.12.2009
AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
TR22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU02.12.2009
AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
TR22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/29]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/27]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/22]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
SM22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT22.01.2014
BE22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
HR22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT22.01.2014
NO22.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02061273  (WATER CROSSING INC [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 18 - line 28; figures 1,5,6 *;
 [A]US2007046028  (GIZARA ANDREW R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1890032  (LODHAL MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] *;
 [A]CA2436187  (HUANG LUNG-PIN) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - line 7 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 21; figures 1,4 *;
 [XA]US2006055175  (GRINBLAT ZINOVY D [US]) [X] 4,14 * abstract * [A] 1,2;
 [XA]US1768716  (PAUL SHISHKOFF) [X] 4,5,14 * page 1, line 61 - line 96 * * page 2, line 114 - line 119 * [A] 1,2;
 [A]WO2008019436  (SEADOV PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,15 * page 7, line 4 - line 8 *
by applicantWO0225107
    "High Temperature Metal Hydrides as Heat Storage Materials for Solar and Related Applications", INT J MOL SCI., (200901), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 325 - 344,