Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2291312

EP2291312 - USE OF A CAPSULE TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/10]CAPSULE TREATMENT APPARATUS
[2012/52]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2011/10]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUSSEMART, Christophe S.
9 route de Champ Poirier
F-74500 Lugrin / FR
02 / LORETAN, Maxime
Grand Clos 35A
CH-1869 Massongex / CH
03 / PERENTES, Alexandre
Avenue Virgile Rossel 10
CH-1012 Lausanne / CH
 [2011/10]
Representative(s)Schnyder, Frank Simon
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]Schnyder, Frank Simon
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2011/10]Schnyder, Frank Simon
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date09765878.518.06.2009
[2011/10]
WO2009EP57560
Priority number, dateEP2008015865320.06.2008         Original published format: EP 08158653
[2011/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009153298
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2291312
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009
[2011/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2291312
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65B69/00
[2011/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/10]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER KAPSELBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2012/52]
English:USE OF A CAPSULE TREATMENT APPARATUS[2012/52]
French:UTILISATION D' UN APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE CAPSULE[2012/52]
Former [2011/10]KAPSELBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2011/10]CAPSULE TREATMENT APPARATUS
Former [2011/10]APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE CAPSULE
Entry into regional phase20.01.2011National basic fee paid 
20.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2010Observations by third parties
20.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/10]
10.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2013Fee for grant paid
03.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.02.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Franssen, Guy Jacques
Allée des Platanes 2
4053 Embourg / BE
 [2015/29]
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  25.02.2014   
Franssen, Guy Jacques
Avenue Reine Astrid 71b/3.3
4900 Spa / BE
04.04.2014No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
17.04.2014No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
10.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2014Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
03.06.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.07.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/47]
Appeal following opposition18.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1691/15
18.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
27.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
27.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.08.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.06.2009
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MK24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU18.06.2009
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2016/32]HU18.06.2009
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2016/28]BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2016/16]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2016/10]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
ES19.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2015/51]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
AT18.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
NL01.01.2015
PT18.03.2015
Former [2015/21]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
NO30.06.2014
NL01.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
LU18.06.2014
NL01.01.2015
Former [2015/09]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
LU18.06.2014
Former [2014/23]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/21]CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY10.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CY10.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/09]HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
Former [2014/08]LT24.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US3386602  (KANAREK JOSEPH S) [X] 1,8,10,11,13-15 * column 1 - column 2, line 53; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US2818985  (IRMSCHER HANS O) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,14 * column 2, lines 5-70; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1430953  (SCHRADEN BIOGAS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * figure 1; claim 1 *
ExaminationWO2008139322
by applicantEP0512468
 EP0602203
 EP0512470
 US3386602
 US2818985
 US2007113705
 EP0512468
otherWO2009153298