blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2291312 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2291312



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 825
17.10.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 45
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
29.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.08.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.08.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
08.08.2016 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
20.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
06.07.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 51
26.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
26.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
25.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
22.04.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
20.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.04.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
15.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.04.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.04.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.02.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
29.02.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
19.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
15.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
15.02.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 13
09.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.02.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.02.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.01.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
18.01.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
11.12.2015 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
11.12.2015 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
13.10.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.08.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 3
21.08.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 8
18.08.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 8
23.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
15.06.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
15.06.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 10
08.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
03.06.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
03.06.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
16.05.2015 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 12
16.12.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2014 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
10.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.12.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
29.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.09.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.06.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.06.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.04.2014 Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition Opposition 1
07.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2014 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
03.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
28.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
28.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
25.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.06.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.06.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
03.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.06.2013 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.01.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.01.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.01.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.01.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.09.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 17
27.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
27.09.2012 Description Search / examination 17
27.09.2012 Drawings Search / examination 5
27.09.2012 Drawings Search / examination 5
27.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.09.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.07.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
06.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.12.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 15
30.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.03.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
10.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.02.2011 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.01.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.01.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 17
15.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.12.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.12.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.12.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 17
15.12.2010 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.12.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
27.10.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.01.2010 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
23.12.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
20.08.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.08.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.08.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
18.06.2009 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.06.2009 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
18.06.2009 Description PCT receiving Office 16
18.06.2009 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 2
18.06.2009 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5
18.06.2009 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 27
20.11.2008 Annex Search / examination 2
20.11.2008 Annex Search / examination 11
20.11.2008 Annex Search / examination 2