Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2319537

EP2319537 - STABILIZER FOR LYMPH VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shiseido Company, Ltd.
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[2011/19]
Inventor(s)01 / KAJIYA, Kentaro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(KANAZAWA-HAKKEI)
2-12-1 Fukuura
Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-8643 / JP
02 / OTA, Masahiro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA)
2-2-1 Hayabuchi
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
 [2015/18]
Former [2011/19]01 / KAJIYA, Kentaro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(KANAZAWA-HAKKEI) 2-12-1 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-8643 / JP
02 / OTA, Masahiro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2011/19]Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel
Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09766685.317.06.2009
[2011/19]
WO2009JP61047
Priority number, dateJP2008015962318.06.2008         Original published format: JP 2008159623
[2011/19]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009154237
Date:23.12.2009
Language:JA
[2009/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2319537
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2319537
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.12.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/343, A61K31/34, A61K36/54, A61K36/00, A61P7/10, A61P17/16, A61P43/00, A61K38/18, A61K38/45
[2014/45]
Former International [2012/05]A61K45/00, A61K31/11, A61K31/34, A61K36/00, A61K38/22, A61P7/10, A61P17/16, A61P43/00, A61K31/343, A61K38/18, A61K36/254, A61K36/54
Former International [2011/19]A61K45/00, A61K31/11, A61K31/34, A61K36/00, A61K38/22, A61P7/10, A61P17/16, A61P43/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2011/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:STABILISATOR FÜR EIN LYMPHGEFÄSS[2011/19]
English:STABILIZER FOR LYMPH VESSEL[2011/19]
French:STABILISATEUR DE VAISSEAU LYMPHATIQUE[2011/19]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2011Translation filed 
14.01.2011National basic fee paid 
14.01.2011Search fee paid 
14.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/19]
20.07.2011Observations by third parties
21.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2015Fee for grant paid
17.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12181426.3  / EP2526955
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2013
Opposition(s)01.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.06.2009
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU17.06.2009
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2017/03]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/23]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GB29.07.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE17.06.2015
LU17.06.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
LU17.06.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6607756  (ROSENSTIEL LEONIE [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * the whole document * * abstract * * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 56 - line 67 * * column 3, line 25 - line 35 * * column 4, line 9 - line 27 * * tables 1,2 * * example 2 * [I] 5,10;
 [X]WO2008059310  (AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECH PVT LTD [IN]; PATELL VILLOO MORAWALA [IN]) [X] 6,7,9,10 * the whole document * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * example 1 * * claims 1-4,6 *
 [XI]  - "Habb Waasli", TKDL, (1811), Database accession no. MH5/2791, XP002666404 [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * the whole document * [I] 5,10
 [XI]  - "Itreefal Ghudadi", TKDL, (1811), Database accession no. MH1/3719, XP002666405 [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * the whole document * [I] 5,10
 [XI]  - "Kukkilathy Vadakam", TKDL, (1911), Database accession no. GP03/245, XP002666406 [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * the whole document * [I] 5,10
International search[X]  - TUOMAS TAMMELA ET AL., "Angiopoietin-1 promotes lymphatic sprouting and hyperplasia", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, pages 4642 - 4648, XP008140930

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-08-3327
 [X]  - NICHOLAS W. GALE ET AL., "Angiopoietin-2 is Required for Postnatal Angiogenesis and Lymphatic Patterning, and Only the Latter Role is Rescued by Angiopoietin-1", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 411 - 423, XP008052324

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00217-4
by applicantJPH10265350
 JPH08268887
 JP2004352652
    - JIKKEN IGAKU, EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 24, no. 18, pages 133 - 138
    - JUSSILA, L.; ALITALO, K., "Vascular growth factors and lymphangiogenesis", PHYSIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 82, pages 673 - 700
    - NAGY ET AL., "Vascular permeability factor/vascular endothelial growth factor induces lymphangiogenesis as well as angiogenesis", J. EXP. MED., (2002), vol. 196, pages 1497 - 1506
    - KAJIYA, K.; HIRAKAWA, S.; DETMAR, M., "VEGF-A mediates UVB-induced impairment of lymphatic vessel function", AM. J. PATHOL., (2006), vol. 169, pages 1496 - 1503
    - EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 24, no. 18, pages 139 - 143
    - KAJIYA, K. ET AL., "Hepatocyte growth factor promotes lymphatic vessel formation and function", EMBO. J., (2005), vol. 24, pages 2885 - 95
    - EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 52 - 57
other   - "Habb Waasli", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/2791, XP002666404
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 388
    - "Itreefal Ghudadi", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3719, XP002666405
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, ILAAJ-AL-AMRAAZ, (1921), page 324
    - "Itreefal Ghudadi", TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/28, XP003029016
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 8
    - "Itreefal Ghudadi", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/2780, XP003029017
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 386
    - "Kanda Kirahanikku Chooranam", TKDL, Database accession no. GP02/396, XP003029018
    - YUGI, Yugi Munivar Vaithya Chinthamani, (1976), pages 220 - 221
    - "Kukkilathy Vadakam", TKDL, Database accession no. GP03/245, XP002666406
    - AGASTHIYAR, Agathiyar Vaithya Kaviyam, (2001), pages 177 - 179
    - "Kuttathirku Chaaru -1", TKDL, Database accession no. GP02/687, XP003029019
    - YUGI, Yugi Munivar Vaithya Chinthamani, (1976), page 357