EP2394327 - TRACTION BATTERY WITH INCREASED RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/50] | MORE READILY AVAILABLE TRACTION BATTERY | ||
[2013/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, Holger Rotkaeppchenweg 31 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 09768092.0 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009EP67084 | Priority number, date | DE20091000676 | 06.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009000676 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010088999 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394327 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394327 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/46, H02J7/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/441 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H02J7/0031 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAKTIONSBATTERIE MIT ERHÖHTER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT | [2011/50] | English: | TRACTION BATTERY WITH INCREASED RELIABILITY | [2013/29] | French: | BATTERIE DE TRACTION AVEC UNE MEILLEURE FIABILITÉ | [2013/29] |
Former [2011/50] | MORE READILY AVAILABLE TRACTION BATTERY | ||
Former [2011/50] | BATTERIE DE TRACTION À FIABILITÉ ACCRUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2009 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | IE | 14.12.2013 | LU | 14.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | NO | 27.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5773962 (NOR JIRI K [CA]) [X] 1,5 * figures 2,3 * * column 10, line 61 - column 12, line 4 * * column 12, line 32 - line 50 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]JP2000182598 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract *[A] 2-4; | [XA]US2003071523 (SILVERMAN MARTIN S [US]) [X] 1,5 * figures 3,6 * * paragraph [0039] * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US6593669 (LEMAIRE PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,5 * figure 2 * * column 8, line 60 - line 67 * [A] 2-4 |