Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2380148

EP2380148 - METHOD AND TOKEN FOR MANAGING ONE PROCESSING RELATING TO AN APPLICATION SUPPORTED OR TO BE SUPPORTED BY A TOKEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales Dis France SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[2019/36]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BERNABEU, Gil
576 route d'aubagne
F-13420 GEMENOS / FR
 [2011/43]
Representative(s)Scheer, Luc , et al
Thales Dis France SA
Intellectual Property Department
525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne
CS12023
13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/43](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date09768351.024.11.2009
WO2009EP65709
Priority number, dateEP2008030596217.12.2008         Original published format: EP 08305962
[2011/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010069717
Date:24.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2380148
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010
[2011/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[2011/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND TOKEN ZUM VERWALTEN EINER VERARBEITUNG IN BEZUG AUF EINE ANWENDUNG, DIE DURCH EIN TOKEN UNTERSTÜTZT WIRD ODER ZU UNTERSTÜTZEN IST[2011/43]
English:METHOD AND TOKEN FOR MANAGING ONE PROCESSING RELATING TO AN APPLICATION SUPPORTED OR TO BE SUPPORTED BY A TOKEN[2011/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET JETON POUR LA GESTION D'UN TRAITEMENT RELATIF À UNE APPLICATION PRISE EN CHARGE OU À ÊTRE PRISE EN CHARGE PAR UN JETON[2011/43]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2011National basic fee paid 
18.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
07.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.09.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination19.11.2015Appeal received No.  T0347/16
02.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
20.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6915124  (KIESSLING JOHAN [SE] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 32 * * figure 3 * [I] 2-10;
 [A]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Specification of the SIM Application Toolkit (SAT) for the Subscriber Identity Module - Mobile Equipment (SIM-ME) interface (3GPP TS 11.14 version 8.18.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 101 267", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070601), vol. 3-T3;SMG9, no. V8.18.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014037555 [A] 1-10 * page 20 - page 69 *
 [A]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Security mechanisms for SIM application toolkit; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 03.48 version 8.9.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 101 181", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20050601), vol. 3-T3;SMG9, no. V8.9.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014030428 [A] 1-10 * page 22 - page 24 *
 [A]  - "Globalplatform Card Soecification Version 2.1.1", GLOBALPLATFORM,, (20060301), XP007908232 [A] 1-10 * page 22 - page 110 *