Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2358855

EP2358855 - AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/34]AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING DETERGENT TABLETS
[2014/28]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
FJI Patents Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsselsdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HOLDERBAUM, Thomas
Wilhelmine-Fliedner-Straße 12
40723 Hilden / DE
02 / WARKOTSCH, Nadine
Haus-Endt-Straße 26
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / ZIPFEL, Johannes
Paul-Gerhardt-Strasse 2
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2011/34]
Application number, filing date09768354.401.12.2009
[2011/34]
WO2009EP66101
Priority number, dateDE2008106046905.12.2008         Original published format: DE102008060469
[2011/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010063689
Date:10.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2358855
Date:24.08.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010
[2011/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2358855
Date:19.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/10, C11D3/20, C11D17/00, C11D3/37
[2011/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2011/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MASCHINELLE GESCHIRRSPÜLMITTELTABLETTE[2011/34]
English:AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING TABLET[2014/28]
French:TABLETTE DE DÉTERGENT POUR LAVE-VAISSELLE[2011/34]
Former [2011/34]AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING DETERGENT TABLETS
Entry into regional phase03.02.2011National basic fee paid 
03.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
24.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
27.02.2015Fee for grant paid
27.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.02.2015Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
17.07.2015Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.05.2016  24.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponents representative
f & e patent, et al
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2016/26]
05.07.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.08.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0023/18
14.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2009
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
AT01.12.2015
IE01.12.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/36]HU01.12.2009
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
AT01.12.2015
IE01.12.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE01.12.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE01.12.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
LU01.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/20]DK19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT19.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2009024780  (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,3-4,6-7 * example 1; table 1 *;
 [XP]FR2926088  (EUROTAB SA [FR]) [XP] 1-4,6,15 * table 5 *;
 [XI]EP1043389  (DALLI WERKE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claim -; table 3 * [I] 1-4;
 [X]WO02053697  (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-2,4,6-7 * page 21 *;
 [X]WO0224848  (RECKITT BENCKISER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * examples 1-4; claim - *;
 [I]DE19640759  (SCHMITZ HERBERT [DE]) [I] 1-4,6-7,10,12-15 * column 3 - column 5 *;
 [A]US6548473  (JACQUES KAMIEL THOEN CHRISTIAA [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 39 *;
 [A]WO9958633  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,10-11,15 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2006094634  (JEKEL MAREN [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,10-11,15 * page 8 - page 11; example - *;
 [A]DE4121307  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-2; claim - *
OppositionWO2009024780
 WO9958633
 WO0224848
 WO0049128
 EP1491621
 EP1043389
 WO2008119834
 EP0835825
 US2003203825
 US2003083223
 WO0105922
 WO9905248
 US6410500
 DE102007013141
 WO0066701