Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2307455 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2307455



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1261
20.01.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
20.01.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
20.01.2023 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.09.2022 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 3
09.09.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
09.09.2022 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 9
10.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.08.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 12
05.08.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 11
05.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.08.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
05.08.2022 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
07.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.07.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.07.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.05.2022 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
09.05.2022 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.03.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
01.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.11.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.10.2021 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
28.10.2021 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
25.10.2021 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.04.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.04.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
31.03.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.03.2020 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.03.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
26.11.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.11.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.11.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
05.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.11.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.11.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 26
05.11.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
05.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.11.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
22.10.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 5
10.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.09.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.09.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.08.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 31
22.08.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 31
22.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.07.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
05.07.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
05.07.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.07.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
05.07.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
05.07.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.07.2019 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 29
05.07.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.05.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.05.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
23.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.04.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 38
13.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
08.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
08.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
08.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
08.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
08.03.2019 Claims Opposition 4
08.03.2019 Claims Opposition 4
08.03.2019 Claims Opposition 3
08.03.2019 Claims Opposition 3
08.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
08.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
05.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.09.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
14.09.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.09.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
26.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.06.2018 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
21.06.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
31.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
29.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 33
22.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.05.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.05.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
24.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.01.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.01.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
21.12.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
21.12.2017 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
22.03.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.02.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 48
25.10.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 48
07.10.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.09.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 38
08.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
08.08.2016 Description Search / examination 38
08.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.04.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.04.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
10.12.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Registration under Rule 23 EPC Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
03.07.2013 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
03.07.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.12.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.12.2011 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.11.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
28.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.03.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.03.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.02.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.01.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
14.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
04.11.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48
30.12.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.12.2009 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 49
11.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
11.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
11.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
23.07.2009 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
10.07.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.07.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 3
10.07.2009 Description International Searching Authority 38
10.07.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 7