Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2310840

EP2310840 - HIGH EFFICIENCY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jarisch, Wolfram R.
11102 Candlelight Lane
Potomac, MD 20854 / US
[2011/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2011/16]
Representative(s)Waddington, Richard
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2011/16]Waddington, Richard
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date09771249.129.06.2009
[2011/16]
WO2009US49102
Priority number, dateUS2008012945927.06.2008         Original published format: US 129459
[2011/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009158718
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2310840
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009
[2011/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2310840
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US30.12.2009
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00
[2012/40]
Former International [2011/16]G01N23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/16]
TitleGerman:HOCHEFFIZIENTE COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE[2011/16]
English:HIGH EFFICIENCY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY[2011/16]
French:TOMOGRAPHIE INFORMATISÉE DE GRANDE EFFICACITÉ[2011/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2011National basic fee paid 
11.01.2011Search fee paid 
11.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
27.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2014Fee for grant paid
04.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2013
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2009
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU29.06.2009
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2016/16]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/21]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IE29.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/18]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/09]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
LU29.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2007120300  (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-13 * page 1, line 19 - line 23 * * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 19 * * page 12, line 10 - line 15 * * page 14, line 13 - line 18 * * figures 1,5,10,12 * [Y] 3,14,15 [I] 10,16-25;
 [X]US2006104410  (SAUER KEN D [US], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [Y]US4593355  (CHASE RICHARD C [US]) [Y] 3,14,15 * column 10, line 3 - line 10; figure 6 *
International search[X]US6018562  (WILLSON PAUL D [US]);
 [A]US5566341  (ROBERSON GEORGE P [US], et al);
 [A]US6345113  (CRAWFORD CARL R [US], et al)