blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2310840 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2310840



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 191
23.01.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 12
04.02.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
04.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.10.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
12.08.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
27.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
27.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
27.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.09.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.09.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.09.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
21.04.2011 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
23.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.11.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.02.2010 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
21.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
30.12.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
30.12.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32