Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2310840


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
18.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
10.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
23.01.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
10.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
14.02.2014 (Expected) grant published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.10.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2013 Amendment by applicant
31.08.2012 Supplementary search report published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
31.08.2012 Change - classification published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
03.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2011 Change - extension states published on  05.10.2011  [2011/40]
01.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2011 Amendment by applicant
18.03.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.04.2011  [2011/16]
18.03.2011 Request for examination filed published on  20.04.2011  [2011/16]
14.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
01.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication