blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2310840 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180035037 EP09771249 EP11807508



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012009535Global Dossier 19.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
US83820510 16.07.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011158492Global Dossier 30.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US200913001592 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8660330Global Dossier 25.02.2014B2
US2010278413 04.11.2010A1
Priority number Date
US83820510 16.07.2010
US12945908 27.06.2008
US49398909 29.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8660328Global Dossier 25.02.2014B2
US2009324047 31.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12945908 27.06.2008
US49398909 29.06.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20120138256Global Dossier 26.12.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5543448BGlobal Dossier 09.07.2014B2
JP2011526367 06.10.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2593906Global Dossier 27.07.2016A4
EP2593906 22.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US83820510 16.07.2010
WO2011US44005 14.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103052959BGlobal Dossier 29.03.2017B
CN103052959 17.04.2013A
Priority number Date
US83820510 16.07.2010
WO2011US44005 14.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2310840Global Dossier 19.03.2014B1
EP2310840 03.10.2012A4
EP2310840 20.04.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009261945 21.04.2011A2
AU2009261945 30.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2729166 30.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102132149B 28.05.2014B
CN102132149 20.07.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN9038DELNP2010 24.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2009US49102 29.06.2009
US12945908 27.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI555514B 01.11.2016B
TW201204327 01.02.2012A
Priority number Date
US83820510 16.07.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009158718Global Dossier 30.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12945908 27.06.2008