Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2373154

EP2373154 - BARLEY AND MALT-DERIVED BEVERAGES WITH LOW DIMETHYL SULFIDE LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2017New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1799 Copenhagen V / DK
For all designated states
Heineken Supply Chain B.V.
2e Weteringplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
[2011/47]
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1760 Copenhagen V / DK
For all designated states
Heineken Supply Chain B.V.
2e Weteringplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KNUDSEN, Søren
Bakkesvinget 18
DK-2760 Måløv / DK
02 / HAMBRAEUS, Gustav
Musikgatan 3
S-21585 Malmö / SE
03 / BECH, Lene Mølskov
Liljehaven 83
DK-2765 Smørum / DK
04 / SØRENSEN, Steen, Bech
Uglevej 15
DK-2680 Solrød Strand / DK
05 / SKADHAUGE, Birgitte
Lindehøjvej 31B
DK-3460 Birkerød / DK
06 / BREDDAM, Klaus
Agertoften 31
Osted
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
07 / OLSEN, Ole
Holmbladsgade 102, 2.tv.
DK-2300 CopenhagenS / DK
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2016/16]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2011/41]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
DK-1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date09771493.501.12.2009
[2016/16]
WO2009DK50315
Priority number, dateDK2008000170803.12.2008         Original published format: DK 200801708
[2011/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010063288
Date:10.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2373154
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2373154
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP14.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12C1/18, C12C12/00, C12N15/82, C12N9/10
[2013/14]
Former International [2011/41]A01H5/10, C12C1/18, C12C7/00, C12C12/00, C12N15/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesAL16.01.2012
BA16.01.2012
RS16.01.2012
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKE AUS GERSTE UND MALZ MIT NIEDRIGEM GEHALT AN DIMETHYLSULFID[2013/33]
English:BARLEY AND MALT-DERIVED BEVERAGES WITH LOW DIMETHYL SULFIDE LEVEL[2011/41]
French:BOISSONS À BASE D'ORGE ET DE MALT PRÉSENTANT UN FAIBLE NIVEAU DE SULFURE DE DIMÉTHYLE[2011/41]
Former [2011/41]GETRÄNKE AUF GERSTEN- UND MALZGRUNDLAGE MIT NIEDRIGEM DIMETHYLSULFIDGEHALT
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase04.07.2011National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/08]
17.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2013Fee for grant paid
16.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2017   
Then, Christoph/Tippe R./Arb. b. Land. AbL./AG der Umw. i. d. EKD (AGU)/Arche Noah/Bund Naturschutz/ Brot f.d. Welt/Campact/Ev
Gen-ethis. Netzwerk/IG Nachbau/Noah/ProSpecieRara/
Slow Food Deutschland/Umweltinstitut München/
Verband Katholisches Landvolk
Frohschammerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 [2017/10]
11.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
[2017/13]
Former [2017/10]EE20.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006057684  (BISGAARD-FRANTZEN HENRIK [DK], et al) [X] 1-11,24,26-39,41,42,55,56 * paragraphs [0019] - [0020] - [0 38] , [0 57] , [ 106] - [0116]; examples 3, 4; tables 4, 7 *;
 [X]AU3857893  (JORGENSON FOODS PROPRIETARY LT) [X] 1-11,24,26-39,41,42,55,56 * pages 1, 4; example - *;
 [X]US5242694  (REUTHER HANS [US]) [X] 1-11,24,26-39,41,42,55,56 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2005204437  (BREDDAM KLAUS [DK], et al) [A] 1-56 * paragraph [0190]; claim - *;
 [A]WO02053721  (CARLSBERG RES LAB [DK], et al) [A] 1-56 * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 7 * * page 21, line 15 - page 23, line 2; examples 1,6; claims 25-26; tables 3-7 *;
 [A]DE202007005281U  (HERTEL MARCUS [DE]) [A] 1-56 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [A]WO0015757  (CARLSBERG AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-56 * claims 1, 12, 36, 41, 55, 56 *;
 [A]GB2220955  (CARLSBERG AS [DK]) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *;
 [T]  - HOTZEL HELMUT ET AL, "Recovery and characterization of residual DNA from beer as a prerequisite for the detection of genetically modified ingredients", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 209, no. 3-4, ISSN 1438-2377, pages 192 - 196, XP002635202 [T] * page 194 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002170050478
 [A]  - HIROTA N ET AL, "Brewing performance of malted lipoxygenase-1 null barley and effect on the flavor stability of beer", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS. MINNEAPOLIS, US, (20060501), vol. 83, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1094/CC-83-0250, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 250 - 254, XP009124704 [A] 1-56 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CC-83-0250