blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2373154


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.04.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
10.04.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
11.03.2019 Change: Appeal number
20.02.2019 New entry: Appeal number
20.02.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.02.2019 Change: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.02.2019 Change: Appeal number
12.02.2019 New entry: Appeal number
12.02.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
09.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
09.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
03.03.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
19.09.2017 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
10.05.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Opposition filed published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
18.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
24.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.08.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.07.2013 Change - German title published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
28.06.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.06.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2013 Change - classification published on  03.04.2013  [2013/14]
01.03.2013 Change - classification published on  03.04.2013  [2013/14]
01.03.2013 Change - German title published on  03.04.2013  [2013/14]
13.02.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.10.2012 First examination report
21.02.2012 Amendment by applicant
20.01.2012 Request for examination filed published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
20.01.2012 Change - designated states published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
20.01.2012 Change - extension states published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
19.01.2012 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
25.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2011 Change - applicant published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
09.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
29.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
10.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2011 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2011 New entry: Biological material
16.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication