blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2373154 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180027413 EP09771493 EP09801148 EP11729247



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011150933Global Dossier 07.06.2012A3
WO2011150933 08.12.2011A2
Priority number Date
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010075860Global Dossier 14.07.2011A3
WO2010075860 08.07.2010A2
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017183611Global Dossier 29.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US200913132765 01.12.2009
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
US200913141579 28.12.2009
US201715413094 23.01.2017
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
US201113701604 31.05.2011
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9834760Global Dossier 05.12.2017B2
US2011293779 01.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9587210Global Dossier 07.03.2017B2
US2013095207 18.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9363959Global Dossier 14.06.2016B2
US2011318469 29.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101769525BGlobal Dossier 18.08.2017B1
KR20110094111 19.08.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6007174BGlobal Dossier 12.10.2016B2
JP2013526875 27.06.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5774997BGlobal Dossier 09.09.2015B2
JP2012510277 10.05.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5670347BGlobal Dossier 18.02.2015B2
JP2012513744 21.06.2012A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2575433Global Dossier 07.09.2016B1
EP2575433 10.04.2013A2
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2384110Global Dossier 20.04.2016B1
EP2384110 09.11.2011A2
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103209584BGlobal Dossier 29.10.2014B
CN103209584 17.07.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2801142Global Dossier 30.04.2019C
CA2801142 08.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2373154Global Dossier 20.04.2016B1
EP2373154 12.10.2011A2
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AP3392 31.08.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR074913 23.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR081635 10.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009321894B 31.07.2014B2
AU2009321894 14.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009335397B 07.08.2014B2
AU2009335397 04.08.2011A8
AU2009335397 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011260702B 31.07.2014B2
AU2011260702 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0922349 22.05.2018A2
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012030806 12.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2744836 10.06.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2747225 08.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102291982B 04.06.2014B
CN102291982 21.12.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102333440B 23.07.2014B
CN102333440 25.01.2012A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2575433T 19.12.2016T3
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA028532 30.11.2017B1
EA201170906 28.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA029777 31.05.2018B1
EA201170739 30.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA031578 31.01.2019B1
EA201291444 28.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2586616T 17.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2600353T 08.02.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1162851 14.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1162852 09.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20160874T 07.10.2016T1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
EP09771493 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUE029857T 28.04.2017T2
Priority number Date
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL213324 29.10.2015A
IL213324D 31.07.2011D0
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LT2373154T 10.10.2016T
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2011005619 09.09.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2011006588 27.09.2011A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MY155960 31.12.2015A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MY159408 30.12.2016A
Priority number Date
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ593605 26.10.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ593962 27.04.2012A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG171940 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG185696 30.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI554216B 21.10.2016B
TW201208586 01.03.2012A
Priority number Date
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA105197 25.04.2014C2
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA106597 25.09.2014C2
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UY32372 26.02.2010A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201104844 31.10.2012B
Priority number Date
WO2009DK50315 01.12.2009
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201105047 31.10.2012B
Priority number Date
DKPA200801851 30.12.2008
WO2009DK50355 28.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201209379 26.02.2014B
Priority number Date
WO2011DK50186 31.05.2011
DKPA201070243 03.06.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010063288Global Dossier 14.07.2011A3
WO2010063288 10.06.2010A2
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR074430 19.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE030303T 28.04.2017T2
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL2373154T 31.01.2017T3
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2373154T 26.07.2016T
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UY32282 30.06.2010A
Priority number Date
DKPA200801708 03.12.2008