Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2300842

EP2300842 - MR IMAGING WITH EXTENDED FIELD OF VIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2013/39]
Former [2011/13]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BOERNERT, Peter
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / KEUPP, Jochen
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / KOKEN, Peter
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / NEHRKE, Kay
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2011/13]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date09772945.318.06.2009
[2011/13]
WO2009IB52606
Priority number, dateEP2008015967504.07.2008         Original published format: EP 08159675
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010001285
Date:07.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2300842
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/563
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/13]
TitleGerman:MR-ABBILDUNG MIT ERWEITERTEM ANZEIGEFELD[2011/13]
English:MR IMAGING WITH EXTENDED FIELD OF VIEW[2011/13]
French:IMAGERIE PAR RM AVEC UN CHAMP DE VISUALISATION ÉTENDU[2011/13]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2011National basic fee paid 
04.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/13]
10.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2013
11.12.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.01.2014Appeal received No.  T1019/14
18.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1790286  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0022] , [0025] - [0056] - [0065] - [0075]; figures 3-6,9,11 *;
 [X]WO2004077086  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 25 - page 10, line 3; figures 1-4; claims 1-13 *;
 [X]EP1362550  (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0010] - [0025] - [0033]; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO2006088453  (ZHAO LEI [MA], et al) [X] 1-3,7-13 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 15 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 19 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 16; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO2007010488  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,12,13 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 8 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 32; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]  - P.BÖRNERT ET AL., "Principles of Whole-Body Continuously-Moving-Table MRI", JMRI, (20080625), vol. 28, pages 1 - 12, XP002544792 [A] 5,6,8,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmri.21339
by applicantWO2006111882
 EP1790286
 EP1362550
 WO2006088453