Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2296982

EP2296982 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND REMOVAL OF WIRES FROM BALES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Technologies, Inc.
Keilasatama 5
02150 Espoo / FI
[2014/19]
Former [2011/12]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
P O Box 1220
00101 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / NORBERG, Mats
Solum 221
S-860 25 Kovland / SE
02 / NORDHÄLLING, Stefan
Övre Raholmsvägen 54
S-865 51 Ankarsvik / SE
03 / STRAND, Göran
Sörfors 242
S-864 92 Matfors / SE
04 / JAKOBSSON, Martin
Haxås 570
S-83070 Hammerdal / SE
 [2011/12]
Representative(s)Saitton, Hanna Johanna
Valmet AB
Patents Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[2014/08]
Former [2013/42]Saitton, Hanna Johanna
Metso Paper Sweden AB Gustav Gidlöfs väg 4
85194 Sundsvall / SE
Former [2011/12]Saitton, Johanna
Metso Paper Sundsvall AB
S-851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Application number, filing date09773851.218.06.2009
[2011/12]
WO2009SE50767
Priority number, dateSE2008000160204.07.2008         Original published format: SE 0801602
[2011/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010002336
Date:07.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2296982
Date:23.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010
[2011/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2296982
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.01.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65B69/00, B65B57/08
[2013/36]
Former International [2011/12]B65B69/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/12]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND ENTFERNEN VON DRÄHTEN AUS BALLEN[2011/12]
English:DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND REMOVAL OF WIRES FROM BALES[2011/12]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉCOUPE ET DE RETRAIT DE FILS À PARTIR DE BALLES[2011/12]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2010National basic fee paid 
21.12.2010Search fee paid 
21.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/12]
18.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2014Fee for grant paid
14.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.10.2013
Opposition(s)08.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.06.2009
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MK05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU18.06.2009
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU18.06.2009
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/28]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/16]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/24]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GB18.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/21]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IE18.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/20]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/09]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
LU18.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/08]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/02]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
ES05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US5680691  (MAROM AVI [IL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5297329
 [A]US5163216
 [A]JPH06239323
 [A]US4850087
 [A]US5680691
 [A]US6393688
 [A]WO9217373