Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2379593

EP2379593 - MODULATION OF THE VPS 10-DOMAIN RECEPTOR FAMILY FOR THE TREATMENT OF MENTAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
29.10.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H. Lundbeck A/S
Ottiliavej 9
2500 Valby / DK
[2011/43]
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Simon Glerup
Agerbaeksvej 5
DK-8240 Risskov / DK
02 / BOLCHO, Ulrich
Nytoften 20
DK-8462 Harlev / DK
03 / JENSEN, Kimmo
Februarvej 5
DK-8210 Aarhus V / DK
04 / NYKJAER, Anders
Skolevangs Allé 1B
DK-8240 Risskov / DK
 [2011/43]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/43](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date09774817.217.12.2009
WO2009DK50341
Priority number, dateDK2008000182519.12.2008         Original published format: DK 200801825
[2011/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010069331
Date:24.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2379593
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010
[2011/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P25/00, A61K38/00
[2011/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesAL30.09.2011
BA30.09.2011
RS30.09.2011
TitleGerman:MODULATION DER VPS-10-DOMÄNENREZEPTORFAMILIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEISTES- UND VERHALTENSSTÖRUNGEN[2011/43]
English:MODULATION OF THE VPS 10-DOMAIN RECEPTOR FAMILY FOR THE TREATMENT OF MENTAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DISORDERS[2011/43]
French:MODULATION DE LA FAMILLE DE RÉCEPTEURS À DOMAINE VPS10P POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES MENTAUX ET COMPORTEMENTAUX[2011/43]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2011National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/45]
03.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0628/17
22.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)EP16187227.0  / EP3165537
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2004056385  (UNIV AARHUS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12-25,28,38,39,43-66,75 * claims 11, 15-16, 27 * [I] 3-5,9-11,26,27,29-31,36,37,40-42,67,68,76;
 [XI]WO2008074329  (NEURONICON APS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12-25,28,38,39,43-66,75 * claims 1, 6-12, 19 * [I] 3-5,9-11,26,27,29-31,36,37,40-42,67,68,76
 [A]  - DUMAN R S, Pathophysiology of depression: The concept of synaptic plasticity, EUROPEAN PSYCHIATRY, VOL. 17, NR. SUPPL. 3, PAGE(S) 306-310, (200207), ISSN 0924-9338, XP002579772 [A] 1-31,36-68,75,76 * page 308, column right, paragraph last *
by applicantUS6013478
 US4554101
 US5789208
 US6335163
 WO9824884
 WO9945962
 WO9409131
 WO9413804
 WO9413806
 US5260203
 US5455030
 US4881175
 US5132405
 US5091513
 US5476786
 US5013653
 US5258498
 US5482858
 US6071517
 WO8800052
 US4954617
 WO9410332
 US4474893
 EP0120694
 EP0125023
 EP0171496
 EP0173494
 EP0194276
 GB2188638
 WO9100906
 WO9110741
 WO9203918
 WO9203917
 US4816258
 US4927408
 US4904475
 US4588580
 US4788062
    - "Production of Polyclonal Antisera", GREEN, Immunochemical Protocols, HUMANA PRESS, (1992), pages 1 - 5
    - "Production of Polyclonal Antisera in Rabbits, Rats, Mice and Hamsters", COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in immunology, (1992), page 2.4.1
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - COLIGAN ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOAY, (1992), pages 2.5.1 - 2.6.7
    - HARLOW ET AL., Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1988), page 726
    - COLIGAN ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), pages 2.7.1 - 2.7.12,2.9.1-2.9.3
    - "Purification of Immunoglobulin G (IgG)", BARNES ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1992), vol. 10, pages 79 - 104
    - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2146
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIP- MAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A.), (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - RIECHMANN, L. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327
    - JONES, P. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - QUEEN, C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033
    - KOZAK, J. BIOL.CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 19867 - 19870
    - GRAZIANO, R.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 10, pages 4996 - 5002
    - MORTON, H.C. ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 16, pages 423 - 440
    - MONTEIRO, R.C. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1764
    - D. M. KRANZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 5807
    - LONBERG, N. ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859
    - GREEN, L. L. ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21
    - MORRISON, S. L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - BRUGGEMAN ET AL., YEAR IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 7, pages 33 - 40
    - TUAILLON ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3720 - 3724
    - BRUGGEMAN ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 21, pages 1323 - 1326
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258
    - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 7, page 33
    - DUCHO- SAL ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, page 258
    - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1996), vol. 14, page 309
    - A. M. SCOTT ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 60, pages 3254 - 3261
    - A. NISSIM; Y. CHERNAJOVSKY, Handb. Exp. Pharmacol., (2008), vol. 181, pages 3 - 18
    - A. MOUNTAIN; J. R. ADAIR, BIOTECHNOL. GENET. ENG. REV., (1992), vol. 10, pages 1 - 142
    - LEE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, pages 1945 - 1948
    - Transdermal Delivery of Drugs, CRC PRESS, (1987), vol. 1-3
    - XU, L ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387
    - BYLUND; TOEWS, AM J PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 265, pages L421 - 9
    - NYKJAER ET AL., FEBS, (1992), vol. 300, page 13
    - NIELSEN ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 2180
    - POISBEAU ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (1997), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 3467 - 75
    - ANDERSEN, O. M.; J. REICHE ET AL., "Neuronal sorting protein-related receptor sorLA/LR11 regulates processing of the amyloid precursor protein", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, no. 38, pages 13461 - 6, XP055351569
    - BAUM, A. E.; N. AKULA ET AL., "A genome-wide association study implicates diacylglycerol kinase eta (DGKH) and several other genes in the etiology of bipolar disorder", MOL PSYCHIATRY, (2008), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 197 - 207
    - BEN-ARI, Y.; R. COSSART, "Kainate, a double agent that generates seizures: two decades of progress.", TRENDS NEUROSCI, (2000), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 580 - 7
    - BUZSAKI, G.; A. DRAGUHN, "Neuronal oscillations in cortical networks.", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, no. 5679, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1099745, pages 1926 - 9, XP055180861

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1099745
    - CHALON, P.; N. VITA ET AL., "Molecular cloning of a levocabastine-sensitive neurotensin binding site", FEBS LETT, (1996), vol. 386, no. 2-3, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(96)00397-3, pages 91 - 4, XP002048142

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(96)00397-3
    - CHEN, B.; D. DOWLATSHAHI ET AL., "Increased hippocampal BDNF immunoreactivity in subjects treated with antidepressant medication.", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2001), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 260 - 5
    - CHEN, Z. Y.; A. LERACI ET AL., "Sortilin controls intracellular sorting of brain-derived neurotrophic factor to the regulated secretory pathway", J NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 25, no. 26, doi:doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1017-05.2005, pages 6156 - 66, XP055346388

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1017-05.2005
    - CHEN, Z. Y.; D. JING ET AL., "Genetic variant BDNF (Val66Met) polymorphism alters anxiety-related behavior", SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 314, no. 5796, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1129663, pages 140 - 3, XP002528852

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1129663
    - CIECHANOWSKI, P. S.; W. J. KATON ET AL., "Depression and diabetes: impact of depressive symptoms on adherence, function, and costs", ARCH INTERN MED, (2000), vol. 160, no. 21, pages 3278 - 85
    - CLEE, S. M.; B. S. YANDELL ET AL., "Positional cloning of Sorcs1, a type 2 diabetes quantitative trait locus", NAT GENET, (2006), vol. 38, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/NG1796, pages 688 - 93, XP003027132

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG1796
    - COYLE, J. T., "What can a clock mutation in mice tell us about bipolar disorder?", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 15, pages 6097 - 8
    - DODSON, S. E.; M. GEARING ET AL., "LR11/SorLA expression is reduced in sporadic Alzheimer disease but not in familial Alzheimer disease", J NEUROPATHOL EXP NEUROL, (2006), vol. 65, no. 9, pages 866 - 72
    - DOYLE, C.; C. HOLSCHER ET AL., "The selective neuronal NO synthase inhibitor 7-nitro-indazoe blocks both long-term potentiation and depotentiation of field EPSPs in rat hippocampal CA1 in vivo", J NEUROSCI, (1996), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 418 - 24
    - DRASBEK, K. R.; K. JENSEN, "THIP, a hypnotic and antinociceptive drug, enhances an extrasynaptic GABAA receptor-mediated conductance in mouse neocortex", CEREB CORTEX, (2006), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 1134 - 41
    - DUMAN, R. S.; L. M. MONTEGGIA, "A neurotrophic model for stress-related mood disorders", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 59, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biopsych.2006.02.013, pages 1116 - 27, XP025064015

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2006.02.013
    - EGAN, M. F.; M. KOJIMA ET AL., "The BDNF val66met polymorphism affects activity-dependent secretion of BDNF and human memory and hippocampal function", CELL, (2003), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 257 - 69
    - EINAT, H.; H. K. MANJI, "Cellular plasticity cascades: genes-to-behavior pathways in animal models of bipolar disorder", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 59, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biopsych.2005.11.004, pages 1160 - 71, XP025064020

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2005.11.004
    - FARRANT, M.; Z. NUSSER, "Variations on an inhibitory theme: phasic and tonic activation of GABA(A) receptors", NAT REV NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 215 - 29
    - FRERKING, M.; R. C. MALENKA ET AL., "Brain-derived neurotrophic factor (BDNF) modulates inhibitory, but not excitatory, transmission in the CA1 region of the hippocampus", J NEUROPHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 80, no. 6, pages 3383 - 6
    - GAMA, C. S.; A. C. ANDREAZZA ET AL., "Serum levels of brain-derived neurotrophic factor in patients with schizophrenia and bipolar disorder", NEUROSCI LETT, (2007), vol. 420, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neulet.2007.04.001, pages 45 - 48, XP022093983

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neulet.2007.04.001
    - GOODARZI, M. 0.; D. M. LEHMAN ET AL., "SORCS1: a novel human type 2 diabetes susceptibility gene suggested by the mouse", DIABETES, (2007), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 1922 - 9, XP003027130
    - GRANHALL, C.; H. B. PARK ET AL., "High-resolution quantitative trait locus analysis reveals multiple diabetes susceptibility loci mapped to intervals<800 kb in the species-conserved Niddm1 of the GK rat.", GENETICS, (2006), vol. 174, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1534/GENETICS.106.062208, pages 1565 - 72, XP003027131

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.106.062208
    - HENNEBERGER, C.; R. JUTTNER ET AL., "Postsynaptic action of BDNF on GABAergic synaptic transmission in the superficial layers of the mouse superior colliculus.", J NEUROPHYSIOL, (2002), vol. 88, no. 2, pages 595 - 603
    - HERMANS-BORGMEYER, I.; G. HERMEY ET AL., "Expression of the 100-kDa neurotensin receptor sortilin during mouse embryonal development.", BRAIN RES MOL BRAIN RES, (1999), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 216 - 9
    - HERMEY, G.; S. J. KEAT ET AL., "Characterization of sorCS1, an alternatively spliced receptor with completely different cytoplasmic domains that mediate different trafficking in cells", J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M210851200, pages 7390 - 6, XP002976994

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210851200
    - HERMEY, G.; N. PLATH ET AL., "The three sorCS genes are differentially expressed and regulated by synaptic activity", J NEUROCHEM, (2004), vol. 88, no. 6, pages 1470 - 6
    - HERMEY, G.; I. B. RIEDEL ET AL., "Identification and characterization of SorCS, a third member of a novel receptor family", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1999), vol. 266, no. 2, pages 347 - 51
    - HERMEY, G.; I. B. RIEDEL ET AL., "SorCS1, a member of the novel sorting receptor family, is localized in somata and dendrites of neurons throughout the murine brain", NEUROSCI LETT, (2001), vol. 313, no. 1-2, pages 83 - 7
    - HERMEY, G.; H. C. SCHALLER ET AL., "Transient expression of SorCS in developing telencephalic and mesencephalic structures of the mouse", NEU- ROREPORT, (2001), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 29 - 32
    - HERMEY, G.; S. S. SJOGAARD ET AL., "Tumour necrosis factor alpha-converting enzyme mediates ectodomain shedding of Vps1 Op-domain receptor family members", BIOCHEM J, (2006), vol. 395, no. 2, pages 285 - 93
    - HEWITT, S. A.; J. S. BAINS, "Brain-derived neurotrophic factor silences GABA synapses onto hypothalamic neuroendocrine cells through a postsynaptic dynamin-mediated mechanism.", J NEUROPHYSIOL, (2006), vol. 95, no. 4, pages 2193 - 8
    - HOLDERBACH, R.; K. CLARK ET AL., "Enhanced long-term synaptic depression in an animal model of depression", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2007), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 92 - 100, XP022115071
    - JACOBSEN, L.; P. MADSEN ET AL., "Activation and functional characterization of the mosaic receptor SorLA/LR11", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M100857200, pages 22788 - 96, XP002294171

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M100857200
    - JACOBSEN, L.; P. MADSEN ET AL., "Molecular characterization of a novel human hybrid-type receptor that binds the alpha2-macroglobulin receptor-associated protein", J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, no. 49, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.271.49.31379, pages 31379 - 83, XP002059472

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.49.31379
    - JANSEN, P.; K. GIEHL ET AL., "Roles for the pro-neurotrophin receptor sortilin in neuronal development, aging and brain injury.", NAT NEUROSCI, (2007), vol. 10, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nn2000, pages 1449 - 57, XP002478373

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn2000
    - JENSEN, K.; I. MODY, "L-type Ca2+ channel-mediated short-term plasticity of GABAergic synapses", NAT NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 975 - 6
    - KAILA, K., "Ionic basis of GABAA receptor channel function in the nervous system.", PROQ NEUROBIOL, (1994), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 489 - 537
    - KANAKI, T.; H. BUJO ET AL., "Developmental regulation of LR11 expression in murine brain", DNA CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 647 - 57, XP008006039
    - KEMP, A.; D. MANAHAN-VAUGHAN, "Hippocampal long-term depression: master or minion in declarative memory processes?", TRENDS NEUROSCI, (2007), vol. 30, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tins.2007.01.002, pages 111 - 8, XP005905137

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tins.2007.01.002
    - KUPFER, D. J., "The increasing medical burden in bipolar disorder.", JAMA, (2005), vol. 293, no. 20, pages 2528 - 30
    - LEWIS, D. A.; T. HASHIMOTO ET AL., "Cortical inhibitory neurons and schizophrenia", NAT REV NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nrn1648, pages 312 - 24, XP009161054

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrn1648
    - LOPEZ, A. D.; C. C. MURRAY, "The global burden of disease, 1990-2020", NAT MED, (1998), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 1241 - 3
    - LU, B.; K. MARTINOWICH, "Cell biology of BDNF and its relevance to schizophrenia.", NOVARTIS FOUND SYMP, (2008), vol. 289, pages 119 - 29,129-35,193-5
    - LU, B.; P. T. PANG ET AL., "The yin and yang of neurotrophin action", NAT REV NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nrn1726, pages 603 - 14, XP055346389

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrn1726
    - MAGBY, J. P.; C. BI ET AL., "Single-cell characterization of retrograde signaling by brain-derived neurotrophic factor", J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 26, no. 52, pages 13531 - 6
    - MAGUIRE, J.; I. MODY, "GABA(A)R plasticity during pregnancy: relevance to postpartum depression", NEURON, (2008), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 207 - 13
    - MANJI, H. K.; W. C. DREVETS ET AL., "The cellular neurobiology of depression", NAT MED, (2001), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 541 - 7, XP008120223
    - MARCUSSON, E. G.; B. F. HORAZDOVSKY ET AL., "The sorting receptor for yeast vacuolar carboxypeptidase Y is encoded by the VPS10 gene", CELL, (1994), vol. 77, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(94)90219-4, pages 579 - 86, XP027462029

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(94)90219-4
    - MARTINOWICH, K.; H. MANJI ET AL., "New insights into BDNF function in depression and anxiety", NAT NEUROSCI, (2007), vol. 10, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nn1971, pages 1089 - 93, XP055346392

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1971
    - MAZELLA, J.; N. ZSURGER ET AL., "The 100-kDa neurotensin receptor is gp95/sortilin, a non-G-protein-coupled receptor", J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, no. 41, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.273.41.26273, pages 26273 - 6, XP002294172

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.41.26273
    - MICHELSON, D.; C. STRATAKIS ET AL., "Bone mineral density in women with depression", N ENQL J MED, (1996), vol. 335, no. 16, pages 1176 - 81
    - MOTOI, Y.; T. AIZAWA ET AL., "Neuronal localization of a novel mosaic apolipoprotein E receptor, LR11, in rat and human brain", BRAIN RES, (1999), vol. 833, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0006-8993(99)01542-5, pages 209 - 15, XP002565538

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(99)01542-5
    - MUNCK PETERSEN, C.; M. S. NIELSEN ET AL., "Propeptide cleavage conditions sortilin/neurotensin receptor-3 for ligand binding", EMBO J, (1999), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1093/emboj/18.3.595, pages 595 - 604, XP002565541

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/18.3.595
    - MUSSELMAN, D. L.; D. L. EVANS ET AL., "The relationship of depression to cardiovascular disease: epidemiology, biology, and treatment.", ARCH GEN PSYCHIATRY, (1998), vol. 55, no. 7, pages 580 - 92
    - NAGAPPAN, G.; B. LU, "Activity-dependent modulation of the BDNF receptor TrkB: mechanisms and implications", TRENDS NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 464 - 71
    - NAKAMURA, K.; K. NAMEKATA ET AL., "Intracellular sortilin expression pattern regulates proNGF-induced naturally occurring cell death during development.", CELL DEATH DIFFER, (2007), vol. 14, no. 8, pages 1552 - 4
    - NEVES-PEREIRA, M.; E. MUNDO ET AL., "The brain-derived neurotrophic factor gene confers susceptibility to bipolar disorder: evidence from a family-based association study", AM J HUM GENET, (2002), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 651 - 5
    - NIELSEN, M. S.; C. JACOBSEN ET AL., "Sortilin/neurotensin receptor-3 binds and mediates degradation of lipoprotein lipase", J BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.274.13.8832, pages 8832 - 6, XP001018061

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.13.8832
    - NYKJAER, A.; R. LEE ET AL., "Sortilin is essential for proNGF-induced neuronal cell death", NATURE, (2004), vol. 427, no. 6977, doi:doi:10.1038/nature02319, pages 843 - 8, XP002321660

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02319
    - OFFE, K.; S. E. DODSON ET AL., "The lipoprotein receptor LR11 regulates amyloid beta production and amyloid precursor protein traffic in endosomal compartments", J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 1596 - 603
    - OLOFSDOTTER, K.; O. LINDVALL ET AL., "Increased synaptic inhibition in dentate gyrus of mice with reduced levels of endogenous brain-derived neurotrophic factor.", NEUROSCIENCE, (2000), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 531 - 9
    - PANG, P. T.; H. K. TENG ET AL., "Cleavage of proBDNF by tPA/plasmin is essential for long-term hippocampal plasticity", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 306, no. 5695, pages 487 - 91
    - PETERSEN, C. M.; M. S. NIELSEN ET AL., "Molecular identification of a novel candidate sorting receptor purified from human brain by receptor-associated protein affinity chromatography", J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, no. 6, pages 3599 - 605
    - POISBEAU, P.; S. R. WILLIAMS ET AL., "Silent GABAA synapses during flurazepam withdrawal are region-specific in the hippocampal formation", J NEUROSCI, (1997), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 3467 - 75
    - POO, M. M., "Neurotrophins as synaptic modulators.", NAT REV NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 24 - 32
    - PORSOLT, R. D.; M. LE PICHON ET AL., "Depression: a new animal model sensitive to antidepressant treatments", NATURE, (1977), vol. 266, no. 5604, pages 730 - 2
    - REZGAOUI, M.; G. HERMEY ET AL., "Identification of SorCS2, a novel member of the VPS10 domain containing receptor family, prominently expressed in the developing mouse brain.", MECH DEV, (2001), vol. 100, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0925-4773(00)00523-2, pages 335 - 8, XP055349177

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4773(00)00523-2
    - RIVERA, C.; H. LI ET AL., "BDNF-induced TrkB activation down-regulates the K+-CI- cotransporter KCC2 and impairs neuronal CI- extrusion", J CELL BIOL, (2002), vol. 159, no. 5, pages 747 - 52
    - ROGAEVA, E.; Y. MENG ET AL., "The neuronal sortilin-related receptor SORL1 is genetically associated with Alzheimer disease", NAT GENET, (2007), vol. 39, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/ng1943, pages 168 - 77, XP055050412

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1943
    - ROYBAL, K.; D. THEOBOLD ET AL., "Mania-like behavior induced by disruption of CLOCK.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 15, pages 6406 - 11
    - SAGER, K. L.; J. WUU ET AL., "Neuronal LR11/sorLA expression is reduced in mild cognitive impairment.", ANN NEUROL, (2007), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 640 - 7
    - SCHERZER, C. R.; K. OFFE ET AL., "Loss of apolipoprotein E receptor LR11 in Alzheimer disease", ARCH NEUROL, (2004), vol. 61, no. 8, pages 1200 - 5
    - SCHULZ, R.; S. R. BEACH ET AL., "Association between depression and mortality in older adults: the Cardiovascular Health Study", ARCH INTERN MED, (2000), vol. 160, no. 12, pages 1761 - 8
    - SCHUMACHER, J.; R. A. JAMRA ET AL., "Evidence for a relationship between genetic variants at the brain-derived neurotrophic factor (BDNF) locus and major depression", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2005), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 307 - 14
    - SHIRAYAMA, Y.; A. C. CHEN ET AL., "Brain-derived neurotrophic factor produces antidepressant effects in behavioral models of depression.", J NEUROSCI, (2002), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 3251 - 61, XP001107166
    - SIUCIAK, J. A.; D. R. LEWIS ET AL., "Antidepressant-like effect of brain-derived neurotrophic factor (BDNF).", PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (1997), vol. 56, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0091-3057(96)00169-4, pages 131 - 7, XP005187676

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-3057(96)00169-4
    - SOMOGYI, P.; G. TAMAS ET AL., "Salient features of synaptic organisation in the cerebral cortex.", BRAIN RES BRAIN RES REV, (1998), vol. 26, no. 2-3, pages 113 - 35
    - SPOELGEN, R.; C. A. VON ARNIM ET AL., "Interaction of the cytosolic domains of sorLA/LR11 with the amyloid precursor protein (APP) and beta-secretase beta-site APP-cleaving enzyme.", J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 418 - 28
    - TANAKA, K.; M. MASU ET AL., "Structure and functional expression of the cloned rat neurotensin receptor", NEURON, (1990), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0896-6273(90)90137-5, pages 847 - 54, XP027463573

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0896-6273(90)90137-5
    - TENG, H. K.; K. K. TENG ET AL., "ProBDNF induces neuronal apoptosis via activation of a receptor complex of p75NTR and sortilin", J NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 25, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.5123-04.2005, pages 5455 - 63, XP055204550

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.5123-04.2005
    - VINCENT, J. P.; J. MAZELLA ET AL., "Neurotensin and neurotensin receptors", TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (1999), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 302 - 9
    - WESTERGAARD, U. B.; K. KIRKEGAARD ET AL., "SorCS3 does not require propeptide cleavage to bind nerve growth factor", FEBS LETT, (2005), vol. 579, no. 5, pages 1172 - 6, XP027696807
    - WESTERGAARD, U. B.; E. S. SORENSEN ET AL., "Functional organization of the sortilin Vps10p domain", J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, no. 48, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M408873200, pages 50221 - 9, XP002478369

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M408873200
    - WILLNOW, T. E.; HERZ, J., "Homologous recombination for gene replacement in mouse cell lines", METHODS IN CELL BIOLOQV, (1994), vol. 43, pages 305 - 334
    - WOO, N. H.; H. K. TENG ET AL., "Activation of p75NTR by proBDNF facilitates hippocampal long-term depression", NAT NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 8, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nn1510, pages 1069 - 77, XP009145561

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1510
    - XU, L.; R. ANWYL ET AL., "Behavioural stress facilitates the induction of long-term depression in the hippocampus.", NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, no. 6632, pages 497 - 500