blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2376154

EP2376154 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEATING AND/OR THAWING BLOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goji Limited
Beacon House
43 Cedar Avenue
Hamilton HM 12 / BM
[2017/39]
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
Goji Limited
O'Hara House
3 Bermudiana Road
Hamilton HM08 / BM
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
Goji Ltd
Mintflower Place 4th Floor 8 Par-La-Ville Road P.O Box HM 3399
Hamilton HM08 HM PX / BM
Inventor(s)01 / BILCHINSKY, Alexander
26/40 Moshe Dayan
56450 Monosson-Yahud / IL
02 / BEN-SHMUEL, Eran
7 Alumim Street
56541 Savyon / IL
03 / KARNIELI, Ohad
57 HaTamar Street
36015 Kiryat-Tivon / IL
04 / ATZMONY, Daniella
60 Tavor Street
60850 Shoham / IL
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2011/42]Pitchford, James Edward, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date09774984.010.11.2009
WO2009IL01059
Priority number, dateUS20080193248P10.11.2008         Original published format: US 193248 P
US20090253893P22.10.2009         Original published format: US 253893 P
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2010052725
Date:14.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2376154
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.2010
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/44
[2011/42]
CPC:
H05B6/688 (EP,US); H05B6/68 (US); H05B6/6447 (US);
H05B6/664 (US); H05B6/687 (US); H05B6/70 (US);
H05B6/705 (EP,US); Y02B40/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERWÄRMUNG UND/ODER ZUM AUFTAUEN VON BLUTPRODUKTEN[2011/44]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEATING AND/OR THAWING BLOOD PRODUCTS[2011/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR CHAUFFER ET/OU DÉCONGELER DES PRODUITS SANGUINS[2011/42]
Former [2011/42]VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERW?RMUNG UND/ODER ZUM AUFTAUEN VON BLUTPRODUKTEN
Entry into regional phase10.06.2011National basic fee paid 
10.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
27.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/41]
02.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0615763  (TRANSMED MEDTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,23 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [X]US5616268  (CARR KENNETH L [US]) [X] 1,2,23 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2005080373  (WANG XIAOLING [US]) [A] 1,2,23* the whole document *
ExaminationUS4196332
by applicantUS5374811
 US5616268
    - SHERMAN LA, "A new rapid method for thawing fresh frozen plasma", TRANSFUSION, (1974), vol. 14, pages 595 - 7
    - ARENS JF, "Danger of overwarming blood by microwave", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (1971), vol. 218, pages 1045 - 6
    - SOHNGEN D ET AL., "Thawing of fresh-frozen plasma with a new microwave oven", TRANSFUSION, (1988), vol. 28, pages 576 - 80
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.