All documents: EP2373188  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1569
30.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 44
30.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
03.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
03.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
03.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
03.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
03.11.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
03.11.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 8
13.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.09.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
20.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.07.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
08.07.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
08.12.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
08.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.10.2015 General enquiry Appeal 1
23.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Claims Appeal 4
25.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.09.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
11.06.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
29.05.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
29.05.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 46
29.05.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
20.05.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
20.05.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 28
19.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
25.03.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
22.01.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 59
22.01.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
22.01.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
22.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 30
03.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 31
18.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 5
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Claims Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.09.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
01.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
28.04.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.04.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
21.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
21.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
21.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
21.06.2013 Claims Opposition 4
21.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
21.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
22.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.04.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
12.01.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
23.12.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
14.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 59
14.09.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Drawings Search / examination 25
14.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.07.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.06.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
26.04.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
16.09.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
06.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
06.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
06.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
06.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
17.06.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 61
15.02.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.12.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1