Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2373188


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.10.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
08.07.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
12.06.2015 Change - applicant published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
05.06.2015 Change - applicant published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
26.05.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
01.04.2015 Change: Appeal number
26.03.2015 New entry: Appeal number
26.03.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
22.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
28.04.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
24.06.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.04.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
12.12.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.11.2012 Opposition filed published on  19.12.2012  [2012/51]
09.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
24.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2012  [2012/39]
10.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
03.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
27.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
20.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
06.01.2012 (Expected) grant published on  08.02.2012  [2012/06]
29.12.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.12.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2011 Change - extension states published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
01.12.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
09.09.2011 Request for examination filed published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
29.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2011 Amendment by applicant
17.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
18.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication