Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2373188 Family dossiers alert: RSS
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010067393Global Dossier 17.06.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010067289Global Dossier 16.09.2010A3
WO2010067289 17.06.2010A2
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010067288Global Dossier 17.06.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010067285Global Dossier 17.06.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012032422Global Dossier 09.02.2012A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9554602Global Dossier 31.01.2017B2
US2015074882 19.03.2015A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9027170Global Dossier 12.05.2015B2
US2012011642 19.01.2012A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8910319Global Dossier 16.12.2014B2
US2012023648 02.02.2012A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8608191Global Dossier 17.12.2013B2
US2012007344 12.01.2012A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5901696BGlobal Dossier 13.04.2016B2
JP2014198929 23.10.2014A
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5841843BGlobal Dossier 13.01.2016B2
JP2012511457 24.05.2012A
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5671472BGlobal Dossier 18.02.2015B2
JP2012511637 24.05.2012A
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5557847BGlobal Dossier 23.07.2014B2
JP2012511638 24.05.2012A
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5486607BGlobal Dossier 07.05.2014B2
JP2012511458 24.05.2012A
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2412257Global Dossier 29.01.2014B1
EP2412257 01.08.2012A3
EP2412257 01.02.2012A2
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2373524Global Dossier 20.06.2012B1
EP2373524 12.10.2011A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2373190Global Dossier 30.05.2012B1
EP2373190 12.10.2011A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2373189Global Dossier 04.07.2012B1
EP2373189 12.10.2011A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2373188Global Dossier 08.02.2012B1
EP2373188 12.10.2011A2
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT544362T 15.02.2012T
Priority number Date
ITVR20090059 24.04.2009
ITRM20080657 09.12.2008
ITRM20080656 09.12.2008
ITVR20090039 25.03.2009
WO2009IB55516 04.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202009019147U 26.01.2017U1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2381709T 30.05.2012T3
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2388411T 15.10.2012T3
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2390011T 05.11.2012T3
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2390647T 15.11.2012T3
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2460920T 16.05.2014T3
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1392306 24.02.2012B1
ITRM20080656 10.06.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1392307 24.02.2012B1
ITRM20080657 10.06.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1393802 08.05.2012B1
ITVR20090039 26.09.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1393884 11.05.2012B1
ITVR20090059 25.10.2010A1
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1394657 05.07.2012B1
ITVR20090078 30.11.2010A1
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2412257