Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2373188

EP2373188 - GARMENT ADAPTED TO BE ASSOCIATED TO A DEVICE FOR THE PERSONAL PROTECTION OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2017New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
30.06.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 02.08.2017  [2017/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAINESE S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato 35
36060 Molvena (Vicenza) / IT
[2015/29]
Former [2015/28]For all designated states
New D S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato 35
36060 Molvena (Vicenza) / IT
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
Dainese S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato, 35
36060 Molvena VI / IT
Inventor(s)01 / DAINESE, Lino
Dainese S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato 35
I-36060 Molvena VI / IT
02 / RONCO, Luigi
Dainese S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato 35
I-36060 Molvena VI / IT
03 / BELLATI, Alessandro
Dainese S.p.A.
Via dell'Artigianato 35
I-36060 Molvena VI / IT
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Manfrin, Marta , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Stradone San Fermo 21 sc. B
37121 Verona (VR) / IT
[2011/41]
Application number, filing date09775309.904.12.2009
WO2009IB55516
Priority number, dateIT2008RM0065609.12.2008         Original published format: IT RM20080656
IT2008RM0065709.12.2008         Original published format: IT RM20080657
IT2009VR0003925.03.2009         Original published format: IT VR20090039
IT2009VR0005924.04.2009         Original published format: IT VR20090059
[2011/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010067289
Date:17.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2373188
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2373188
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/015, A41D13/018, A41D13/05, A42B3/04
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/06]
TitleGerman:FÜR DIE ZUORDNUNG ZU EINER VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN PERSONENSCHUTZ EINES BENUTZERS GEEIGNETES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK[2011/41]
English:GARMENT ADAPTED TO BE ASSOCIATED TO A DEVICE FOR THE PERSONAL PROTECTION OF A USER[2011/41]
French:VÊTEMENT CONÇU POUR ÊTRE ASSOCIÉ À UN DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À LA PROTECTION PERSONNELLE D'UN UTILISATEUR[2011/41]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2011National basic fee paid 
06.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
14.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2011Fee for grant paid
23.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11174368.8  / EP2412257
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012   
ALPINESTARS Spa
Viale Enrico Fermi 5
31011 Asolo (TV) / IT
Opponent's representative
Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al
Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9
31100 Treviso / IT
 [2012/51]
13.12.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/31]
30.01.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0648/15
26.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
21.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2009
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MK08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
SM08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/46]HU04.12.2009
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
SM08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/34]HU04.12.2009
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
SM08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2014/27]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
SM08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2014/21]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/51]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/47]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
IE04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/33]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2012/50]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19640658  (ROMETSCH SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2008044222  (DAINESE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 14 - line 29; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2677856  (DEMARAIS YVES [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2002078484  (ULERT IZAAK A [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010]; figures 2,3 *;
 [XA]US4737994  (GALTON HARRY A [US]) [X] 29-31,35 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,4,8 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 5 * [A] 1;
 [XA]CH697172  (CHRISTIAN KOEPPEL DR MED [CH]) [X] 29-31,35 * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0019]; figures 1,7.12 * [A] 1;
 [A]US4089065  (MCGEE MICHAEL HENRY) [A] 29-35 * column 5, line 6 - line 19; figures 3,5 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 4 *;
 [A]DE8620408U  (FISCHER, HERWIG) [A] 29-35 * page 6, lines 15-31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4507801  (KAVANAGH FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1,29,35 * figure 2; claim 1 *