Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2313584

EP2313584 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK HAVING A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/17]MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK HAVING A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT
[2014/44]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft
Höseler Platz 2
42579 Heiligenhaus / DE
[2011/17]
Inventor(s)01 / NASS, Ulrich
Mellinghofer Strasse 365d
45475 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE
02 / BENDEL, Thorsten
Badenstrasse 50
46149 Oberhausen / DE
03 / OCHTROP, Mathias
Luisenstrasse 93a
46284 Dorsten / DE
 [2011/17]
Representative(s)Nunnenkamp, Jörg , et al
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Nunnenkamp, Jörg
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2011/17]Nunnenkamp, Jörg
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date09776040.903.08.2009
[2014/44]
WO2009DE01073
Priority number, dateDE20082010423U05.08.2008         Original published format: DE 202008010423 U
[2011/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010015236
Date:11.02.2010
Language:DE
[2010/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2313584
Date:27.04.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010
[2011/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2313584
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:E05B81/66, E05B85/26, B60R16/027
[2014/18]
Former International [2011/17]E05B65/32, E05B17/22, B60R16/027, H02J13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜRVERSCHLUSS MIT EINER SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG[2014/44]
English:MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK HAVING A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT[2014/44]
French:FERMETURE DE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE A MOTEUR AVEC UNE CIRCUITERIE[2014/44]
Former [2011/17]KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜRVERSCHLUSS MIT EINER SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG
Former [2011/17]MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK HAVING A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT
Former [2011/17]FERMETURE DE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE A MOTEUR AVEC UNE CIRCUITERIE
Entry into regional phase13.01.2011National basic fee paid 
13.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
21.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2014Fee for grant paid
23.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015   
Brose Schlie systeme GmbH & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Str. 42
42369 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Gottschald, Jan, et al
Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1
40468 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015   
Brose Schlie systeme GmbH & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Str. 42
42369 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Gottschald, Jan, et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Gottschald
Am Mühlenturm 1
40489 Düsseldorf / DE
07.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1426/17
19.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2009
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MK29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
SM29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
AT03.08.2015
GB03.08.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
BE31.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU03.08.2009
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
SM29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
AT03.08.2015
GB03.08.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
BE31.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/21]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
AT03.08.2015
GB03.08.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/50]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
AT03.08.2015
GB03.08.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/34]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
GB03.08.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2016/17]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2016/12]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/37]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
IT29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/35]CY29.10.2014
DK29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/26]CY29.10.2014
ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
HR29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT29.10.2014
NO29.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT29.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[XDI]GB2309481  (CHEVALIER JOHN PHILLIP [GB]) [XD] 1,3-4,9-10 * the whole document * [I] 8;
 [XI]DE10034866  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * [I] 8-9;
 [X]FR2846479  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-4,10 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 33; figures 1-3 *;
 [XI]US2002050841  (MURR ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * [I] 7;
 [XDI]JP2001049952  (ASMO CO LTD) [XD] 1,3-5,9-10 * abstract * [I] 8;
 [X]WO9728338  (CHEVALIER JOHN PHILLIP [GB]) [X] 1,8,10 * page 3, line 10 - line 23; figure 1 * * page 5, line 7 - line 13 *;
 [XI]DE4414734  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,6,10 * column 1, line 67 - column 4, line 24; figures 1,2 * [I] 7-8;
 [X]EP1544388  (BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0039] , [0042] , [0043]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2778939  (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 10, line 17; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4896637  (YAMAMOTO KYOHEI [JP]) [A] 1-2 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 33; figure 3 *
by applicantGB2309481
 WO9728338
 DE4414734
 US2002050841
 DE19643947
 JP2001049952