Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2326448

EP2326448 - A CONTROL SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De Lille, Arnout
Kapelaanstraat 7
9990 Maldegem / BE
For all designated states
De Lille, Bern
Kapelaanstraat 7
9990 Maldegem / BE
[2011/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2011/22]
Representative(s)Hostens, Veerle
KOB NV
Patents
President Kennedypark 31 C
8500 Kortrijk / BE
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]BiiP cvba
Culliganlaan 1B
1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE
Former [2011/22]BiiP cvba
Culliganlaan 1B
1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE
Application number, filing date09777179.414.07.2009
[2011/22]
WO2009EP05109
Priority number, dateEP2008001470019.08.2008         Original published format: EP 08014700
[2011/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010020310
Date:25.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2326448
Date:01.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010
[2011/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2326448
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:B23D47/04, B27B5/065, B23D59/00, G05B19/408
[2011/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/22]
TitleGerman:STEUERSYSTEM UND DAMIT VERBUNDENES SCHNEIDVERFAHREN[2014/48]
English:A CONTROL SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR CUTTING[2011/22]
French:SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOUPAGE[2014/48]
Former [2011/22]STEUERSYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGES SCHNEIDVERFAHREN
Former [2011/22]SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase21.03.2011National basic fee paid 
21.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/22]
05.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2015Fee for grant paid
19.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11174222.7  / EP2377652
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.12.2015  17.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
HOMAG Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH
Holzmastrasse 3
75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 [2017/24]
Former [2016/03]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.2015  17.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
HOLZMA Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH
Holzmastrasse 3
75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
15.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.09.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.09.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2656/17
05.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
07.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.07.2009
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MK04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
IE14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU14.07.2009
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
IE14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2017/21]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
IE14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2016/37]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
IE14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2016/33]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
IE14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2016/23]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB14.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2016/22]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
Former [2016/15]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU14.07.2015
Former [2016/13]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/12]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/07]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/03]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/50]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/49]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/41]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/39]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/38]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/36]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/35]ES04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/33]ES04.03.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9933600  (GIBEN IMPIANTI SPA [IT]; BENUZZI PIERGIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1,11 * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 21 * * figures 2,4t,5n,5o,5q *;
 [A]EP0891847  (SCM GROUP AUTEC DIVISION SPA [IT] SCM GROUP SPA [IT]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, lines 25-29 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5099896  (RITOLA EDWARD [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 4, lines 33-40 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 5 * * column 11, lines 42-60 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3844426  (CAMPBELL J) [A] 1,11 * column W *;
 [A]FR2797332  (SCHNEIDER AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 8 * * claim - * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4392401  (ESS WILFRIED [AT]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, lines 14-54 * * column 4, lines 57-59 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4206670  (BENUZZI GINO [IT]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, lines 9-56 * * figures 4-8 *;
 [A]US4827446  (KAWAMURA HIDEAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,11 * column 1, lines 6-55 *;
 [A]EP1712966  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0012] , [0013] *;
 [A]DE20107572U  (PAUL OTT GMBH LAMBACH [AT]) [A] 1,11 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * claim 3 *;
 [A]EP1810801  (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PREKWINKEL F, "Rechnergeführte Produktionssysteme für die Holzindustrie", HOLZ ALS ROH- UND WERKSTOFF, SPRINGER-VERLAG. BERLIN, DE, (19911201), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 0018-3768, pages 457 - 464, XP002122120 [A] 1,11,1,11 * page 458, paragraph 2.1 - page 463, paragraph 3.3 * * figures 5-9,11 *
ExaminationUS2008155002
OppositionWO9933600
 DE3111256
 DE3737228
 US3844426
 WO9534865
 EP1247606
 WO2010020310
    - Firma Bässler Verpackungssysteme GmbH, "Bässler Programmschieber Quersäge HFV33/33/22/L (Maschienennummer : 0-241-06-4476)", Holzma Betriebsanleitung (User Manual ), (20070000), pages 1 - 8, XP055269186
    - Firma Bässler Verpackungssysteme GmbH, "Bässler Programmschieber Quersäge HFV33/33/22/L", Holzma Product Data Sheet, (20010000), page 1, XP055269195
    - Holzma Maschienenbau GmbH, "Fixomat HFL23, HFV23, HFL33 und HFV33", Holzma Prospekt, (19990000), pages 9.1 - 9.9