Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2326578

EP2326578 - STORAGE DEVICE HAVING PROTRUSION MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.10.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kardex Produktion Deutschland GmbH
Megamat-Platz 1
86476 Neuburg/Kammel / DE
[2011/22]
Inventor(s)01 / JUNGEN, Karl-Heinz
Töpferring 26c
76764 Rheinzabern / DE
02 / BURKART, Walter
Wilhelm-Danner-Strasse 31
76287 Rheinstetten / DE
 [2011/22]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/22]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09778507.514.09.2009
[2011/22]
WO2009EP06632
Priority number, dateDE2008104836722.09.2008         Original published format: DE102008048367
[2011/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010031525
Date:25.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2326578
Date:01.06.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010
[2011/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/04, B65G1/00
[2011/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/22]
TitleGerman:LAGERVORRICHTUNG MIT ÜBERSTANDSKONTROLLE[2011/22]
English:STORAGE DEVICE HAVING PROTRUSION MONITORING[2011/22]
French:DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE AVEC CONTRÔLE DE DÉPASSEMENT[2011/22]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2011National basic fee paid 
25.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/22]
03.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2013Observations by third parties
24.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2016Observations by third parties
13.01.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2017
17.01.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination07.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1374/17
07.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH11301811  (DAIFUKU KK) [X] 1,4-6,11 * figures 2,3,6 *;
 [Y]DE102005038019  (CEDES AG [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE10115757  (BELLHEIMER METALLWERK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [XY]JPH0640508  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [X] 1-2,11 * figure - * [Y] 3-6,13-16;
 [Y]DE4233688  (BELLHEIMER METALLWERK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3-6,13-16 * figure - *;
 [X]JPS56145016  (KITO KK) [X] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1038804  (BELLHEIMER METALLWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6015302  (DAIFUKU MACHINERY WORKS) [A] 1,11 * abstract *
by applicantDE10115765
 DE4233688
 DE19501718
 DE10115757
otherDE10115757
 DE102005038019
    - CEDES, "TECHNISCHE BESCHREIBUNG SAFEC 200M - SICHERHEITS-AUSWERTEGERäT", CEDES VERSION 0.9/13. HERGESTELLT UNTER ISO 9001:2000, (200504), pages 1 - 52, XP003030095