Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2326685

EP2326685 - BODY, PARTICULARLY MOLDED BODY MADE OF POLYSTYRENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2015/12]
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
H.C. Carbon GmbH
Ziegelstraße 7
91126 Rednitzhembach / DE
Former [2011/22]For all designated states
H.C. Carbon GmbH
Allersberger Strasse 185/A4
90461 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HANDL, Werner
Fußstraße 3a
90518 Altdorf / DE
 [2011/22]
Representative(s)Pronovem
Office Van Malderen
Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K
Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2
4020 Liège / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/08]Leyder, Francis
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Former [2012/44]Förster, Susanne
Stippl Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2011/22]Förster, Susanne
Stippl Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date09778539.816.09.2009
[2011/22]
WO2009EP06677
Priority number, dateDE2008104759417.09.2008         Original published format: DE102008047594
[2011/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010031537
Date:25.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2326685
Date:01.06.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010
[2011/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2326685
Date:31.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/00, C08L25/06
[2011/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/22]
TitleGerman:KÖRPER, INSBESONDERE FORMKÖRPER AUS POLYSTYROL[2011/22]
English:BODY, PARTICULARLY MOLDED BODY MADE OF POLYSTYRENE[2011/22]
French:CORPS, EN PARTICULIER CORPS MOULÉ EN POLYSTYRÈNE[2011/22]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2011National basic fee paid 
08.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/22]
08.04.2011Observations by third parties
03.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2012Fee for grant paid
04.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
versalis S.p.A.
Piazza Boldrini 1
20097 San Donato Milanese / IT
Opponent's representative
Bottero, Carlo, et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
versalis S.p.A.
Piazza Boldrini 1
20097 San Donato Milanese / IT
Opponent's representative
Bottero, Carlo, et al
Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
10.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition28.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0093/16
17.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.09.2009
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
MK31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
IT16.09.2013
LU16.09.2013
AT16.09.2014
[2016/12]
Former [2015/34]HU16.09.2009
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
MK31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
IT16.09.2013
LU16.09.2013
Former [2015/32]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
MK31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
IT16.09.2013
Former [2015/24]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
IT16.09.2013
Former [2014/38]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
IT16.09.2013
Former [2014/33]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE16.09.2013
Former [2014/20]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/52]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]DK31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/26]HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/23]HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
Former [2013/20]LT31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPS60199062  ;
 JPS60199062  [ ] (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD);
 [XA]SU1278343
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 46, Database accession no. 1985-287708, XP002553268 & JPS60199062 A 19851008 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1,7,12 * abstract * [A] 2-6,8-11,13-15
    [ ] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002554763 [ ] * column A *
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 33, Database accession no. 1987-233349, XP002553246 & SU1278343 A1 19861223 (MAGN MIN-METAL INST) [X] 1-2 * abstract * [A] 3-15
by applicantEP0620246
 WO9745477
 WO9851734
 WO0043442
 JPS60199062
    - "DATABASE WPI"
otherWO2009135695
 EP2274370